Antonio Williams et al v. Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC
Plaintiff: James Arias and Antonio Williams
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive and Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01250
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
2 Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:10-cv-00809 VAP(OPx). Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-01250 VAP(KKx). Signed by Judge Virginia A. Phillips (rn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Related Case(s) #9 filed by Plaintiffs James Arias, Antonio Williams. (Nourmand, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by DEFENDANT Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC. AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT Related Case(s): 10-cv-00809-VAP-OP; 12-cv-00692-VAP-OP; 14-cv-02206-VAP-KK; 19-cv-04217-VAP-KK (Hays, Corinne)
July 8, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/22/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-13)(lh)
July 8, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC amending Class Action Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs James Arias, Antonio Williams. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-10)(lh)
July 8, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/19/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-7)(lh)
July 8, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC., Does 1 through 100. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs James Arias, Antonio Williams. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/18/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, 1-1 #1 ) (lh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #5 , Declaration #3 served on 7/8/2019. (Cowie, Paul)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC, identifying Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Co., LLC, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC Antonio Williams, James Arias. (Cowie, Paul)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC identifying Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Cowie, Paul)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Robin Rohwer re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC. (Cowie, Paul)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC. (Cowie, Paul)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS1833454 Receipt No: 0973-24042446 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13) (Attorney Paul S Cowie added to party Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC(pty:dft))(Cowie, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Williams et al v. Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Arias
Represented By: Melissa Misao Kurata
Represented By: James Alexander De Sario
Represented By: Michael Nourmand
Represented By: Jose Maria D Patino, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Williams
Represented By: Melissa Misao Kurata
Represented By: James Alexander De Sario
Represented By: Michael Nourmand
Represented By: Jose Maria D Patino, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC
Represented By: Corinne K Hays
Represented By: John D Ellis
Represented By: Paul S Cowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?