Georgian Beebe et al v. Callahan Auto Supply, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Georgianne Beebe
Defendant: Darlene Baier, DOES 1-50, Inclusive,, A. Callahan Auto Supply, Inc. DBA Napa Auto Parts, Callahan Auto Supply, Inc. and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv01253
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 20 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Riverside County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Riverside County Superior Court. (mrgo)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION AND REMANDING TO STATE COURT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Dkt. 10, and Plaintiff's stated intent to dismiss the second cause of action, Dkt. 18, the Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's second cause of action alleging violation of the Americans with Disabilities Act ("ADA"). As a result of that dismissal, the Court no longer has subject-matter jurisdiction over this case, which now consists solely of state law violations against a California employer, and thus REMANDS this case to state court. Defendant's request for sanctions is DENIED. Case Remanded to Riverside County Superior Court, MCC1900330. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (mrgo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #13 filed by Plaintiff Georgianne Beebe. (Hernandez, Nancyrose)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 OPPOSITION to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #13 filed by Defendants Darlene Baier, Callahan Auto Supply, Inc.. (Thompson, Daniel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Defendants Darlene Baier, Callahan Auto Supply, Inc.. (Thompson, Daniel)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 OPPOSITION opposition re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case of Related Cases #10 filed by Plaintiff Georgianne Beebe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Plaintiff's DFEH Right to Sue Letter and Complaint, #2 Exhibit "B" Email correspondence to opposing counsel)(Hernandez, Nancyrose)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - The NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE, and hearing on the #10 MOTION to Dismiss Case of Related Cases filed by Defendant are continued from 8/19/2019 to 8/26/2019 at 1:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Georgianne Beebe. Motion set for hearing on 8/26/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Plaintiff's Right to Sue Notice, #2 Exhibit "B" Email to OPC, #3 Exhibit "C" Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #4 Declaration of Nancyrose Hernandez, #5 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Hernandez, Nancyrose)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 SCHEDULING NOTICE: The Initial Status Conference previously scheduled for 08/12/2019 at 3:00 PM has been rescheduled to 8/19/2019 at 1:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Daniel Alan Thompson In Support of First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case of Related Cases #10 of Related Cases filed by Defendants Darlene Baier, Callahan Auto Supply, Inc.. (Thompson, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case of Related Cases filed by Defendant Darlene Baier, Callahan Auto Supply, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/19/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Thompson, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Rebecca Mary O'Kray-Murphy counsel for Defendants Darlene Baier, Callahan Auto Supply, Inc.. Filed by Defendants Darlene Baier, Callahan Auto Supply, Inc.. (O'Kray-Murphy, Rebecca)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 8/12/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Darlene Baier, Callahan Auto Supply, Inc.. (Wojcik, Joseph)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Darlene Baier, Callahan Auto Supply, Inc., identifying Plaintiff GEORGIANNE BEEBE, Defendant CALLAHAN AUTO SUPPLY, INC. DBA NAPA AUTO PARTS, Defendant DARLENE BAIER, Timothy A. Callahan, an individual owner of CALLAHAN AUTO SUPPLY, INC. DBA NAPA AUTO PARTS. (Wojcik, Joseph)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-01253-SVW (SPx). (et)
July 8, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Georgianne Beebe, upon Defendant Callahan Auto Supply, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Daniel Thompson, Defendant Callahan Auto Supply, Inc., dba Napa Auto Parts, a California Corporation. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 11 #1 . (et)
July 8, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Georgianne Beebe, upon Defendant Darlene Baier acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Daniel Thompson, Defendant Darlene Baier. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 10 #1 . (et)
July 8, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Darlene Baier, Callahan Auto Supply, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive, filed by Plaintiff Georgianne Beebe. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/23/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 8 #1 . (et)
July 8, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Darlene Baier, Callahan Auto Supply, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive, filed by Plaintiff Georgianne Beebe. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/26/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 #1 . (et)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, case number MCC1900330 with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 07/08/2019, receipt number 0973-24045534), filed by Defendant A. Callahan Auto Supply, Inc. DBA Napa Auto Parts, Darlene Baier. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Counsel, #5 Notice of Department Assignment, #6 Notice and Acknowledgment, #7 Notice and Acknowledgment, #8 Fist Amended Complaint, #9 Amended Summons, #10 Amended Acknowledgment, #11 Amended Acknowledgment) (Attorney Joseph Michael Wojcik added to party Darlene Baier(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Michael Wojcik added to party A. Callahan Auto Supply, Inc. DBA Napa Auto Parts(pty:dft))(Wojcik, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgian Beebe et al v. Callahan Auto Supply, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgianne Beebe
Represented By: Nancyrose Stephanie Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Baier
Represented By: Joseph Michael Wojcik
Represented By: Rebecca Mary O'Kray-Murphy
Represented By: Robert A Davis, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50, Inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Callahan Auto Supply, Inc. DBA Napa Auto Parts
Represented By: Joseph Michael Wojcik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Callahan Auto Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Michael Wojcik
Represented By: Rebecca Mary O'Kray-Murphy
Represented By: Robert A Davis, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?