Thomas v. People of the State of California
Petitioner: Melinda K Thomas
Respondent: People of the State of California
Case Number: 5:2019cv01261
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Judge Otis D. Wright, II denying Certificate of Appealability. (mat)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, Related to: R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations #8 . IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II for Report and Recommendation (Issued) #6 . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Petition be DENIED and that Judgment be entered dismissing this action without prejudice. (see document for further details) (hr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani and Lodging of Proposed Judgment and Order. Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2019 (dc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), #1 (dc)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order re: Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. On July 5, 2019, Petitioner filed a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody. The Court notes that petitioner failed to provide the Court with her Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (IFP Application Request). The Clerk is directed to provide petitioner with a blank IFP Application Request form, CV-60P. Petitioner is hereby ORDERED to file her IFP Application Request, CV-60P along with a certified copy of her prison trust account statement within 20 days of the service date of this Minute Order. IT IS SO ORDERED (Attachments: #1 Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support) (jlo)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV38, #2 CV-111) (jtil)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Case transferred to the Central District of California, Eastern Division. Files transferred electronically to: *Central District of California, Eastern Division*.*3470 Twelfth Street, 1st Floor**Riverside, CA 92501-3801*. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 7/10/2019.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against People of the State of California, filed by Melinda K. Thomas.($5 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Not Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1251-BAS-MSB. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.(jms) [Transferred from California Southern on 7/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melinda K Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of California
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?