Anthony Robello v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Anthony Robello
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv01269
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Electronic Service)(Covarrubias, Mariel)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Electronic Service)(Attorney Mariel Covarrubias added to party BNSF Railway Company(pty:dft))(Covarrubias, Mariel)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Process Server for Anthony Robello, upon Defendant BNSF Railway Company served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon BNSF Railway Co. c/o CT Corporation System - Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cohen, Christopher)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant BNSF Railway Company. (twdb)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Robello. (Cohen, Christopher)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anthony Robello, (Cohen, Christopher)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Robello. (Cohen, Christopher)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anthony Robello. (Cohen, Christopher)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24060949 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Robello. (Attorney Christopher N Coby Cohen added to party Anthony Robello(pty:pla))(Cohen, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Robello v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Robello
Represented By: Christopher N Coby Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Stephanie L Quinn
Represented By: Mariel Covarrubias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?