Sergio Ramirez v. Schenker Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sergio Ramirez
Defendant: Schenker Logistics, Inc., Schenker, Inc. and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv01304
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Re Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference #12 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 9/6/2019 is CONTINUED to 2/21/2020 at 10:30 AM., and the Parties need not serve initial disclosures or file a joint report, pending finalization of the settlement in Ramos v. Schenker, Inc., Case Number 5:18-cv-01551-JLS-KK. (jp)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from September 6, 2019 filed by Defendant Schenker, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rapoport, Michelle)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 9/6/2019 at 10:30 a.m. See document for details. (tg)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-01551 JLS(KKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym and Judge James V. Selna to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-01304 JLS(KKx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Schenker, Inc.. Related Case(s): 5:18-cv-01551-JLS-KK; 5:18-cv-01728-JLS-KK; 5:18-cv-01931-JLS-KK; 5:18-cv-02129-ODW-KK (Nalbandyan, Hovannes)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge James V. Selna. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-01304 JGB (SPx). (ghap)
July 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Schenker, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/15/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT J)(ghap)
July 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Schenker Logistics, Inc., Schenker, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery), Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Sergio Ramirez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/28/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT I)(ghap) Modified on 7/17/2019 (ghap).
July 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sergio Ramirez, upon Plaintiff Schenker Logistics, Inc. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro-CT Corporation-Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/28/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT H) (ghap)
July 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sergio Ramirez, upon Defendant Schenker, Inc. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro-CT Corporation-Person AUthorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/28/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT H) (ghap)
July 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Schenker Logistics, Inc., Schenker, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Sergio Ramirez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/14/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant Schenker, Inc. (Nalbandyan, Hovannes)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Schenker, Inc., identifying Plaintiff, Sergio Ramirez; Defendant, Schenker, Inc.; Schenker Americas, Inc. (Parent Company of Schenker, Inc.); Schenker AG (Parent Company of Schenker Americas, Inc.); Deutsche Bahn (DB) AG (Parent Company of Schenker AG); Plaintiff, Arthur Ramos (Plaintiff from related case); Plaintiff, Enrique Juarez (Plaintiff from related case); Plaintiff, Armando Fernandez (Plaintiff from related case); and Plaintiffs Tabitha Parker, Megan Estes, and Regina McCorkle. (Nalbandyan, Hovannes)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Schenker, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Nalbandyan, Hovannes)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS1917538 Receipt No: 0973-24094084 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Schenker, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration) (Attorney Hovannes G Nalbandyan added to party Schenker, Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Nalbandyan, Hovannes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sergio Ramirez v. Schenker Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schenker Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schenker, Inc.
Represented By: Hovannes G Nalbandyan
Represented By: Everett Clifton Martin IV
Represented By: Michelle Rapoport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Ramirez
Represented By: Anthony J Orshansky
Represented By: Justin K Kachadoorian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?