Sergio Pesquiera v. United States of America
Petitioner: Sergio Pesquiera
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv01376
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DECLARING PARTIAL WAIVER OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE, COMPELLING DISCLOSURE OF CERTAIN ATTORNEY-CLIENT COMMUNICATIONS, AND EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE, OR CORRECT SENTENCE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255 by Judge Percy Anderson re: #7 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order. The government's response to the motion is due no later than October 25, 2019, and defendant-petitioner's reply in support of the motion is due no later than November 8, 2019. (mrgo)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for (1) Declaring Partial Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege, (2) Compelling Disclosure of Certain Attorney-Client Communications, and (3) Extending Time to Respond to Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ryan, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney David T. Ryan on behalf of respondent United States of America. Assistant United States Attorney Assistant US Attorney LA-CV terminated. (Attorney David T Ryan added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Ryan, David)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court is in receipt of petitioner Sergio Pesquiera's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed on July 26, 2019. The Court orders a briefing schedule. The government's opposition shall be filed no later than August 26, 2019. Petitioner's reply if any shall be filed no later than September 9, 2019. (mrgo)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for details) (mrgo)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (et)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Petitioner Sergio Pesquiera. (et)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 assigned to Judge Percy Anderson. For docketing entries refer to CR Case # 5:17-cr-00161-R-2, filed by Petitioner Sergio Pesquiera. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sergio Pesquiera v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sergio Pesquiera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: David T Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?