Daniel Edward Beeman v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Daniel Edward Beeman
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv01404
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Victor E Bianchini
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Victor E. Bianchini for all further proceedings. Please use the case number 5:19-cv-01404-VEB on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Safa, Cyrus)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel Edward Beeman, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 9/16/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Safa, Cyrus)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Victor E. Bianchini. (see document for details) (hr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (hr)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor E. Bianchini: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Daniel Edward Beeman. (Safa, Cyrus)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Victor E. Bianchini. (ghap)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form #6 . Document number 6 due to clerical error. The docket clerk put the wrong magistrate judge on the CV-25 form on the new action. (ghap)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Victor E Bianchini. (ghap)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Daniel Edward Beeman, (Safa, Cyrus)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Daniel Edward Beeman. (Safa, Cyrus)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Daniel Edward Beeman. (Safa, Cyrus)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Edward Beeman. (Safa, Cyrus)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Edward Beeman. (Attorney Cyrus Safa added to party Daniel Edward Beeman(pty:pla))(Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel Edward Beeman v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Edward Beeman
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?