In Re Aguina Aguina

Appellant: Aguina Aguina
Appellee: Karl T. Anderson
Case Number: 5:2019cv01434
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION filed by Appellant Aguina Aguina. Re: Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election #1 . (iv)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY-BANKRUPTCY APPEAL regarding Pay the Filing fee (28 U.S.C. 1930(b) and (c) forwarded to Judge John F. Walter. (ghap)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Notice of Appeal filing fee was not paid. forwarded to Judge John F. Walter. (ghap)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 8/2/2019. (ghap)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge John F. Walter. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (ghap)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order Approving Stipulation to Abandon Property of the Estate entered on 8/1/2019 by Bankruptcy Judge Wayne E Johnson, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 8/1/2019. Bankruptcy Court case number: 6:17-bk-17472-WJ, Adversary number: N/A, BAP case number: N/A., filed by appellant Aguina Aguina. (Attachments: #1 BK Court Docket Sheets) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Aguina Aguina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Aguina Aguina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Karl T. Anderson
Represented By: Melissa Renae Davis
Represented By: Leonard M Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?