Jake L. Kemp v. Low Cost Interlock, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jake L. Kemp
Defendant: Low Cost Interlock, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01445
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #19 . Extended to October 25, 2019. (twdb)
September 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #15 , Notice of Appearance #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 10/25/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Low Cost Interlock, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)(Tsoumas, Tammy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Low Cost Interlock, Inc. answer now due 10/4/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Low Cost Interlock, Inc..(Tsoumas, Tammy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 AND CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES PURSUANT TO L.R. 7.1-1 filed by Defendant Low Cost Interlock, Inc. (Tsoumas, Tammy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan Faria on behalf of Defendant Low Cost Interlock, Inc. (Attorney Jonathan Faria added to party Low Cost Interlock, Inc.(pty:dft))(Faria, Jonathan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas on behalf of Defendant Low Cost Interlock, Inc. (Attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas added to party Low Cost Interlock, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tsoumas, Tammy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jake L. Kemp, upon Defendant Low Cost Interlock, Inc. served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Johnson, Jesse)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting #10 Non-Resident Attorney Jesse S. Johnson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jake L. Kemp, Plaintiff, designating Russell S. Thompson as local counsel #12 . (twdb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Renewed APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jesse S. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jake L. Kemp (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 8/13/2019, Receipt No. 26JFPRLO) filed by Plaintiff Jake L. Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Thompson, Russell)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jesse S. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jake L. Kemp (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24255245) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jesse S. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jake L. Kemp (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24255245) filed by Plaintiff Jake L. Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Thompson, Russell)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Low Cost Interlock, Inc. (car)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jesse S Johnson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jake L. Kemp, identifying Low Cost Interlock, Inc.. (Thompson, Russell)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jake L. Kemp. (Thompson, Russell)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Jake L. Kemp. (Thompson, Russell)
August 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 08/02/2019, receipt number 26J8BUDT), filed by Plaintiff Jake L. Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Model form, #2 Exhibit B - Lease agreement) (Attorney Russell S Thompson, IV added to party Jake L. Kemp(pty:pla))(Thompson, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jake L. Kemp v. Low Cost Interlock, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake L. Kemp
Represented By: Elliot Albert Rosenberger
Represented By: Jesse S Johnson
Represented By: Russell S Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Low Cost Interlock, Inc.
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Jonathan Faria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?