Edwin Ryan, Jr. et al v. Chino Valley Independent Fire District
Plaintiff: Keith Stroup, Rick Parpan, Leslie Kast, Cory Freestone, Keith Ceccarelli, Charles Addie, Greg Gabel, Casey May, Scott Grier, David Williams, Wayne Fontes, Fernando Caldera, Russell Tao, Brett Underwood, Chris Calvert, Scott Poskitt, James Weinstein, Aaron Patty, Jeffrey Heringer, Scott Lundgren, Daniel Fry, Tyler Johnson, Ethan Sanders, Peter Roebuck, Casey Viscioni, Ryan Pourhassanian, Shane Stocking, Jeffrey Lopez, Carlos Skibar, Edwin Ryan, Jr., Brian Neely, Mark Bozek, Kyle Colonna, Timothy Hudson, Jeffrey Westfall, Steve Tevis, Shaun Higgins, Michael Diehl, Mark Vaerini, Mark Hughes, Blake Lemke, Jason Farnsworth, Rodney Lanthier, Jonathan Cripe, Jared Mitchell, Travis Foster, Travis Flicker, Michael Reilly, Jeffrey Anderson, Michael O'Toole, Joel DeLuca, Chuck Kinne, Ian Haddad, Matthew Heckmann, Adam Barker, Arthur Organista, Brett Mattson, Phillip Sarver, Vincent Myers, Arnold Klement, Peter Morales, Michael Rabehl, Christopher Greene, Michael Moore, Jaramie Duke, Christopher Cragg, Brian Sanchez, Nathan Brooks, Robert Wyatt, Richard Cramton, Christopher Nelson, Glenn Halkett, Trevor Haton, Donald Ross, William Heitmann, Joseph DeSoto, Robert Webber, Nicholas Magallanez, Andrew Simpson, Matthew Robertson, Raymond Santoyo, Philip Vasquez, Robert Pope, Steven Koester, Thomas Kevett, Andrew Hubbard, Harry Friedman, Thomas Kavanaugh, Travis Young, Thomas Lemoine, Douglas Summers, Miguel Lopez, Jeffrey Brady, Jeffrey Tytula, Matthew Gonsalves, Dale Williams, Brian Wafford, Dean Smith, David Flores, Justin Nuber, Bryan Turner, Joseph Bossler, Randall Rudolph, Tyler R. Johnson, Nicholas R. Magallanez, Peter A. Roebuck, Andrew Preston Hubbard, Jeffrey M. Anderson, Daniel K. Fry, Christopher L. Greene, Fernando F. Caldera, Scott R. Grier, Jared R. Mitchell, Dean N. Smith, Timothy R. Hudson, Brian E. Wafford, Mark V. Vaerini, Travis J. Flicker, Arthur G. Organista, Donald N. Ross, Shane G. Stocking, Thomas M. Kavanaugh, Brett Jeremoe Underwood, Jason G. Farnsworth, Arnold E. Klement, Blake P. Lemke, Steve A. Tevis, Robert W. Wyatt, Thomas B. Lemoine, Ethan A. Sanders, Michael P. Moore, Michael D. Diehl, Russel M. Tao, Kyle W. Colonna, Harry E. Friedman, Wayne S. Fontes, David W. Flores, Robert J. Pope, Nathan W. Brooks, Thomas E. Kevett, Travis D. Young, Matthew P. Heckmann, Richard E. Cramton, Scott L. Lundgren, Phillip Anthony Vasquez, Dale M. Williams, Brett A. Mattson, Douglas S. Summers, Scott D. Poskitt, Rodney L. Lanthier, Carlos A. Skibar, Jeffrey L. Lopez, Mark Daniel Hughes, Jonathan W. Cripe, Joseph T. Bossler, Joseph P. DeSoto, Brian A. Sanchez, Cory J. Freestone, Steven R. Koester, Michael S. Rabehl, Casey A. May, Jeffrey B. Westfall, Bryan G. Turner, Jeffrey M. Heringer, Andrew J. Simpson, Christopher Lee Nelson, Randall S. Rudolph, Christopher K. Cragg, Phillip T. Sarver, Jr, Michael J. Reilly, James Robert Weinstein, Keith G. Stroup, Jr, Miguel A. Lopez, Greg M. Gabel, Glenn D. Halkett, Casey Stephen Viscioni, Peter A. Morales, Matthew G. Robertson, Ian M. Haddad, Raymond G. Santoyo, David A. Williams, Rick T. Parpan, Leslie A. Kast, Jeffrey D. Tytula and Keith A. Ceccarelli
Defendant: Chino Valley Independent Fire District
Case Number: 5:2019cv01490
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal of Case with Prejudice #13 . Judgment is entered in this Action and this Action is hereby dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Made JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION for Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Dismissing Case with Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs Charles Addie, Jeffrey M. Anderson, Adam Barker, Joseph T. Bossler, Mark Bozek, Jeffrey Brady, Nathan W. Brooks, Fernando F. Caldera, Chris Calvert, Keith A. Ceccarelli, Kyle W. Colonna, Christopher K. Cragg, Richard E. Cramton, Jonathan W. Cripe, Joel DeLuca, Joseph P. DeSoto, Michael D. Diehl, Jaramie Duke, Jason G. Farnsworth, Travis J. Flicker, David W. Flores, Wayne S. Fontes, Travis Foster, Cory J. Freestone, Harry E. Friedman, Daniel K. Fry, Greg M. Gabel, Matthew Gonsalves, Christopher L. Greene, Scott R. Grier, Ian M. Haddad, Glenn D. Halkett, Trevor Haton, Matthew P. Heckmann, William Heitmann, Jeffrey M. Heringer, Shaun Higgins, Andrew Preston Hubbard, Timothy R. Hudson, Mark Daniel Hughes, Tyler R. Johnson, Leslie A. Kast, Thomas M. Kavanaugh, Thomas E. Kevett, Chuck Kinne, Arnold E. Klement, Steven R. Koester, Rodney L. Lanthier, Blake P. Lemke, Thomas B. Lemoine, Jeffrey L. Lopez, Miguel A. Lopez, Scott L. Lundgren, Nicholas R. Magallanez, Brett A. Mattson, Casey A. May, Jared R. Mitchell, Michael P. Moore, Peter A. Morales, Vincent Myers, Brian Neely, Christopher Lee Nelson, Justin Nuber, Michael O'Toole, Arthur G. Organista, Rick T. Parpan, Aaron Patty, Robert J. Pope, Scott D. Poskitt, Ryan Pourhassanian, Michael S. Rabehl, Michael J. Reilly, Matthew G. Robertson, Peter A. Roebuck, Donald N. Ross, Randall S. Rudolph, Edwin Ryan, Jr., Brian A. Sanchez, Ethan A. Sanders, Raymond G. Santoyo, Phillip T. Sarver, Jr, Andrew J. Simpson, Carlos A. Skibar, Dean N. Smith, Shane G. Stocking, Keith G. Stroup, Jr, Douglas S. Summers, Russel M. Tao, Steve A. Tevis, Bryan G. Turner, Jeffrey D. Tytula, Brett Jeremoe Underwood, Mark V. Vaerini, Phillip Anthony Vasquez, Casey Stephen Viscioni, Brian E. Wafford, Robert Webber, James Robert Weinstein, Jeffrey B. Westfall, Dale M. Williams, David A. Williams, Robert W. Wyatt, Travis D. Young. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Oliver Yee in Support of Approval, #2 Declaration of David E. Mastagni in Support of Approval, #3 Exhibit A - Fully Executed Settlement Agreement, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mastagni, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer K Palagi counsel for Defendant Chino Valley Independent Fire District. Adding Jennifer K. Palagi as counsel of record for Defendant Chino Valley Independent Fire District for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Chino Valley Independent Fire District. (Attorney Jennifer K Palagi added to party Chino Valley Independent Fire District(pty:dft))(Palagi, Jennifer)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Chino Valley Independent Fire District. (twdb)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request,,,,,, #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Charles Addie, Jeffrey M. Anderson, Adam Barker, Joseph T. Bossler, Mark Bozek, Jeffrey Brady, Nathan W. Brooks, Fernando F. Caldera, Chris Calvert, Keith A. Ceccarelli, Kyle W. Colonna, Christopher K. Cragg, Richard E. Cramton, Jonathan W. Cripe, Joel DeLuca, Joseph P. DeSoto, Michael D. Diehl, Jaramie Duke, Jason G. Farnsworth, Travis J. Flicker, David W. Flores, Wayne S. Fontes, Travis Foster, Cory J. Freestone, Harry E. Friedman, Daniel K. Fry, Greg M. Gabel, Matthew Gonsalves, Christopher L. Greene, Scott R. Grier, Ian M. Haddad, Glenn D. Halkett, Trevor Haton, Matthew P. Heckmann, William Heitmann, Jeffrey M. Heringer, Shaun Higgins, Andrew Preston Hubbard, Timothy R. Hudson, Mark Daniel Hughes, Tyler R. Johnson, Leslie A. Kast, Thomas M. Kavanaugh, Thomas E. Kevett, Chuck Kinne, Arnold E. Klement, Steven R. Koester, Rodney L. Lanthier, Blake P. Lemke, Thomas B. Lemoine, Jeffrey L. Lopez, Miguel A. Lopez, Scott L. Lundgren, Nicholas R. Magallanez, Brett A. Mattson, Casey A. May, Jared R. Mitchell, Michael P. Moore, Peter A. Morales, Vincent Myers, Brian Neely, Christopher Lee Nelson, Justin Nuber, Michael O'Toole, Arthur G. Organista, Rick T. Parpan, Aaron Patty, Robert J. Pope, Scott D. Poskitt, Ryan Pourhassanian, Michael S. Rabehl, Michael J. Reilly, Matthew G. Robertson, Peter A. Roebuck, Donald N. Ross, Randall S. Rudolph, Edwin Ryan, Jr., Brian A. Sanchez, Ethan A. Sanders, Raymond G. Santoyo, Phillip T. Sarver, Jr, Andrew J. Simpson, Carlos A. Skibar, Dean N. Smith, Shane G. Stocking, Keith G. Stroup, Jr, Douglas S. Summers, Russel M. Tao, Steve A. Tevis, Bryan G. Turner, Jeffrey D. Tytula, Brett Jeremoe Underwood, Mark V. Vaerini, Phillip Anthony Vasquez, Casey Stephen Viscioni, Brian E. Wafford, Robert Webber, James Robert Weinstein, Jeffrey B. Westfall, Dale M. Williams, David A. Williams, Robert W. Wyatt, Travis D. Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Summons Complaint Face Page)(Mastagni, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Plaintiffs for Consent to be Included as Individual Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs Charles Addie, Jeffrey Anderson, Adam Barker, Joseph Bossler, Mark Bozek, Jeffrey Brady, Nathan Brooks, Fernando Caldera, Chris Calvert, Keith Ceccarelli, Kyle Colonna, Christopher Cragg, Richard Cramton, Jonathan Cripe, Joel DeLuca, Joseph DeSoto, Michael Diehl, Jaramie Duke, Jason Farnsworth, Travis Flicker, David Flores, Wayne Fontes, Travis Foster, Cory Freestone, Harry Friedman, Daniel Fry, Greg Gabel, Matthew Gonsalves, Christopher Greene, Scott Grier, Ian Haddad, Glenn Halkett, Trevor Haton, Matthew Heckmann, William Heitmann, Jeffrey Heringer, Shaun Higgins, Andrew Hubbard, Timothy Hudson, Mark Hughes, Tyler Johnson, Leslie Kast, Thomas Kavanaugh, Thomas Kevett, Chuck Kinne, Arnold Klement, Steven Koester, Rodney Lanthier, Blake Lemke, Thomas Lemoine, Jeffrey Lopez, Miguel Lopez, Scott Lundgren, Nicholas Magallanez, Brett Mattson, Casey May, Jared Mitchell, Michael Moore, Peter Morales, Vincent Myers, Brian Neely, Christopher Nelson, Justin Nuber, Michael O'Toole, Arthur Organista, Rick Parpan, Aaron Patty, Robert Pope, Scott Poskitt, Ryan Pourhassanian, Michael Rabehl, Michael Reilly, Matthew Robertson, Peter Roebuck, Donald Ross, Randall Rudolph, Edwin Ryan, Jr., Brian Sanchez, Ethan Sanders, Raymond Santoyo, Phillip Sarver, Andrew Simpson, Carlos Skibar, Dean Smith, Shane Stocking, Keith Stroup, Douglas Summers, Russell Tao, Steve Tevis, Bryan Turner, Jeffrey Tytula, Brett Underwood, Mark Vaerini, Philip Vasquez, Casey Viscioni, Brian Wafford, Robert Webber, James Weinstein, Jeffrey Westfall, Dale Williams, David Williams, Robert Wyatt, Travis Young (Mastagni, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Charles Addie, Jeffrey Anderson, Adam Barker, Joseph Bossler, Mark Bozek, Jeffrey Brady, Nathan Brooks, Fernando Caldera, Chris Calvert, Keith Ceccarelli, Kyle Colonna, Christopher Cragg, Richard Cramton, Jonathan Cripe, Joel DeLuca, Joseph DeSoto, Michael Diehl, Jaramie Duke, Jason Farnsworth, Travis Flicker, David Flores, Wayne Fontes, Travis Foster, Cory Freestone, Harry Friedman, Daniel Fry, Greg Gabel, Matthew Gonsalves, Christopher Greene, Scott Grier, Ian Haddad, Glenn Halkett, Trevor Haton, Matthew Heckmann, William Heitmann, Jeffrey Heringer, Shaun Higgins, Andrew Hubbard, Timothy Hudson, Mark Hughes, Tyler Johnson, Leslie Kast, Thomas Kavanaugh, Thomas Kevett, Chuck Kinne, Arnold Klement, Steven Koester, Rodney Lanthier, Blake Lemke, Thomas Lemoine, Jeffrey Lopez, Miguel Lopez, Scott Lundgren, Nicholas Magallanez, Brett Mattson, Casey May, Jared Mitchell, Michael Moore, Peter Morales, Vincent Myers, Brian Neely, Christopher Nelson, Justin Nuber, Michael O'Toole, Arthur Organista, Rick Parpan, Aaron Patty, Robert Pope, Scott Poskitt, Ryan Pourhassanian, Michael Rabehl, Michael Reilly, Matthew Robertson, Peter Roebuck, Donald Ross, Randall Rudolph, Edwin Ryan, Jr., Brian Sanchez, Ethan Sanders, Raymond Santoyo, Phillip Sarver, Andrew Simpson, Carlos Skibar, Dean Smith, Shane Stocking, Keith Stroup, Douglas Summers, Russell Tao, Steve Tevis, Bryan Turner, Jeffrey Tytula, Brett Underwood, Mark Vaerini, Philip Vasquez, Casey Viscioni, Brian Wafford, Robert Webber, James Weinstein, Jeffrey Westfall, Dale Williams, David Williams, Robert Wyatt, Travis Young. (Mastagni, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Mastagni, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Charles Addie, Jeffrey Anderson, Adam Barker, Joseph Bossler, Mark Bozek, Jeffrey Brady, Nathan Brooks, Fernando Caldera, Chris Calvert, Keith Ceccarelli, Kyle Colonna, Christopher Cragg, Richard Cramton, Jonathan Cripe, Joel DeLuca, Joseph DeSoto, Michael Diehl, Jaramie Duke, Jason Farnsworth, Travis Flicker, David Flores, Wayne Fontes, Travis Foster, Cory Freestone, Harry Friedman, Daniel Fry, Greg Gabel, Matthew Gonsalves, Christopher Greene, Scott Grier, Ian Haddad, Glenn Halkett, Trevor Haton, Matthew Heckmann, William Heitmann, Jeffrey Heringer, Shaun Higgins, Andrew Hubbard, Timothy Hudson, Mark Hughes, Tyler Johnson, Leslie Kast, Thomas Kavanaugh, Thomas Kevett, Chuck Kinne, Arnold Klement, Steven Koester, Rodney Lanthier, Blake Lemke, Thomas Lemoine, Jeffrey Lopez, Miguel Lopez, Scott Lundgren, Nicholas Magallanez, Brett Mattson, Casey May, Jared Mitchell, Michael Moore, Peter Morales, Vincent Myers, Brian Neely, Christopher Nelson, Justin Nuber, Michael O'Toole, Arthur Organista, Rick Parpan, Aaron Patty, Robert Pope, Scott Poskitt, Ryan Pourhassanian, Michael Rabehl, Michael Reilly, Matthew Robertson, Peter Roebuck, Donald Ross, Randall Rudolph, Edwin Ryan, Jr., Brian Sanchez, Ethan Sanders, Raymond Santoyo, Phillip Sarver, Andrew Simpson, Carlos Skibar, Dean Smith, Shane Stocking, Keith Stroup, Douglas Summers, Russell Tao, Steve Tevis, Bryan Turner, Jeffrey Tytula, Brett Underwood, Mark Vaerini, Philip Vasquez, Casey Viscioni, Brian Wafford, Robert Webber, James Weinstein, Jeffrey Westfall, Dale Williams, David Williams, Robert Wyatt, Travis Young. (Mastagni, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24239650 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Ian Haddad, Scott Grier, Steve Tevis, Brian Neely, Jason Farnsworth, Scott Poskitt, David Williams, Mark Bozek, Ethan Sanders, Cory Freestone, James Weinstein, Joseph DeSoto, Ryan Pourhassanian, Jonathan Cripe, Leslie Kast, Scott Lundgren, Carlos Skibar, Michael Reilly, Harry Friedman, Philip Vasquez, Brett Mattson, Peter Morales, Jaramie Duke, Jeffrey Tytula, Robert Wyatt, Russell Tao, Fernando Caldera, Christopher Greene, Trevor Haton, Chris Calvert, Bryan Turner, Randall Rudolph, Arnold Klement, Keith Stroup, Brett Underwood, Donald Ross, Justin Nuber, Greg Gabel, Rodney Lanthier, Shaun Higgins, Christopher Nelson, Brian Wafford, Casey May, Timothy Hudson, Keith Ceccarelli, Richard Cramton, Raymond Santoyo, Thomas Lemoine, Michael Moore, Nicholas Magallanez, Dale Williams, Michael Rabehl, Arthur Organista, Thomas Kavanaugh, Shane Stocking, Peter Roebuck, Michael Diehl, Vincent Myers, Miguel Lopez, Michael O'Toole, Robert Pope, Rick Parpan, Edwin Ryan, Jr., Joel DeLuca, Douglas Summers, Matthew Gonsalves, Jeffrey Westfall, Phillip Sarver, Travis Foster, Daniel Fry, Andrew Simpson, Matthew Robertson, Andrew Hubbard, Christopher Cragg, Aaron Patty, Jared Mitchell, Steven Koester, Wayne Fontes, Travis Young, Jeffrey Lopez, Brian Sanchez, Travis Flicker, Mark Hughes, Thomas Kevett, David Flores, Kyle Colonna, Casey Viscioni, Joseph Bossler, Dean Smith, Matthew Heckmann, Charles Addie, Mark Vaerini, Nathan Brooks, Blake Lemke, Chuck Kinne, Jeffrey Brady, Jeffrey Heringer, Robert Webber, Jeffrey Anderson, Glenn Halkett, William Heitmann, Tyler Johnson, Adam Barker. (Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Charles Addie(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Jeffrey Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Adam Barker(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Joseph Bossler(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Mark Bozek(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Jeffrey Brady(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Nathan Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Fernando Caldera(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Chris Calvert(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Keith Ceccarelli(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Kyle Colonna(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Christopher Cragg(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Richard Cramton(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Jonathan Cripe(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Joel DeLuca(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Joseph DeSoto(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Michael Diehl(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Jaramie Duke(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Jason Farnsworth(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Travis Flicker(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party David Flores(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Wayne Fontes(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Travis Foster(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Cory Freestone(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Harry Friedman(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Daniel Fry(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Greg Gabel(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Matthew Gonsalves(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Christopher Greene(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Scott Grier(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Ian Haddad(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Glenn Halkett(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Trevor Haton(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Matthew Heckmann(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party William Heitmann(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Jeffrey Heringer(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Shaun Higgins(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Andrew Hubbard(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Timothy Hudson(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Mark Hughes(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Tyler Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Leslie Kast(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Thomas Kavanaugh(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Thomas Kevett(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Chuck Kinne(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Arnold Klement(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Steven Koester(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Rodney Lanthier(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Blake Lemke(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Thomas Lemoine(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Jeffrey Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Miguel Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Scott Lundgren(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Nicholas Magallanez(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Brett Mattson(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Casey May(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Jared Mitchell(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Michael Moore(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Peter Morales(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Vincent Myers(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Brian Neely(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Christopher Nelson(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Justin Nuber(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Michael O'Toole(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Arthur Organista(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Rick Parpan(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Aaron Patty(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Robert Pope(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Scott Poskitt(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Ryan Pourhassanian(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Michael Rabehl(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Michael Reilly(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Matthew Robertson(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Peter Roebuck(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Donald Ross(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Randall Rudolph(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Edwin Ryan, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Brian Sanchez(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Ethan Sanders(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Raymond Santoyo(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Phillip Sarver(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Andrew Simpson(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Carlos Skibar(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Dean Smith(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Shane Stocking(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Keith Stroup(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Douglas Summers(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Russell Tao(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Steve Tevis(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Bryan Turner(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Jeffrey Tytula(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Brett Underwood(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Mark Vaerini(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Philip Vasquez(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Casey Viscioni(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Brian Wafford(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Robert Webber(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party James Weinstein(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Jeffrey Westfall(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Dale Williams(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party David Williams(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Robert Wyatt(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Travis Young(pty:pla))(Mastagni, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwin Ryan, Jr. et al v. Chino Valley Independent Fire District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Stroup
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Parpan
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Kast
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Freestone
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Ceccarelli
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Addie
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Gabel
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey May
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Grier
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Williams
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Fontes
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Caldera
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Tao
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Underwood
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Calvert
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Poskitt
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Weinstein
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Patty
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Heringer
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Lundgren
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Fry
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Johnson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Sanders
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Roebuck
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Viscioni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Pourhassanian
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Stocking
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lopez
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Skibar
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Ryan, Jr.
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Neely
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bozek
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Colonna
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Hudson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Westfall
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Tevis
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Higgins
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Diehl
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Vaerini
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hughes
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Lemke
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Farnsworth
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Lanthier
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Cripe
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Mitchell
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Foster
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Flicker
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Reilly
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Anderson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O'Toole
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel DeLuca
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuck Kinne
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Haddad
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Heckmann
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Barker
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Organista
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Mattson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Sarver
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Myers
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Klement
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Morales
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rabehl
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Greene
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Moore
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaramie Duke
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cragg
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Sanchez
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Brooks
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wyatt
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cramton
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Nelson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Halkett
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Haton
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ross
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Heitmann
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph DeSoto
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Webber
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Magallanez
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Simpson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Robertson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Santoyo
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Vasquez
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Pope
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Koester
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Kevett
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Hubbard
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Friedman
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Kavanaugh
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Young
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lemoine
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Summers
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Lopez
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Brady
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Tytula
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Gonsalves
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Williams
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Wafford
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Smith
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Flores
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Nuber
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Turner
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bossler
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Rudolph
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler R. Johnson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas R. Magallanez
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter A. Roebuck
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Preston Hubbard
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. Anderson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel K. Fry
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Greene
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando F. Caldera
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott R. Grier
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared R. Mitchell
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean N. Smith
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy R. Hudson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian E. Wafford
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark V. Vaerini
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis J. Flicker
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur G. Organista
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald N. Ross
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane G. Stocking
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M. Kavanaugh
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Jeremoe Underwood
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason G. Farnsworth
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold E. Klement
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake P. Lemke
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve A. Tevis
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Wyatt
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas B. Lemoine
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan A. Sanders
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Moore
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Diehl
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russel M. Tao
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle W. Colonna
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry E. Friedman
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne S. Fontes
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Flores
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Pope
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan W. Brooks
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Kevett
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis D. Young
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew P. Heckmann
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E. Cramton
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott L. Lundgren
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Anthony Vasquez
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale M. Williams
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett A. Mattson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas S. Summers
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott D. Poskitt
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney L. Lanthier
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos A. Skibar
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Lopez
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Daniel Hughes
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan W. Cripe
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph T. Bossler
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph P. DeSoto
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian A. Sanchez
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory J. Freestone
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven R. Koester
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Rabehl
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey A. May
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey B. Westfall
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan G. Turner
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. Heringer
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. Simpson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Nelson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall S. Rudolph
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher K. Cragg
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip T. Sarver, Jr
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Reilly
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Robert Weinstein
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith G. Stroup, Jr
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Lopez
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg M. Gabel
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn D. Halkett
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Stephen Viscioni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter A. Morales
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew G. Robertson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian M. Haddad
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond G. Santoyo
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Williams
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick T. Parpan
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie A. Kast
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Tytula
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith A. Ceccarelli
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chino Valley Independent Fire District
Represented By: Jennifer K Palagi
Represented By: Theodore Oliver Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?