Dan Cameron Geddes, Jr. v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Dan Cameron Geddes, Jr.
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv01502
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-1502 KS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Dan Cameron Geddes, Jr.. (Kuntz, William)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dan Cameron Geddes, Jr., upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 8/30/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz, Title Unknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Carly Sase, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown Signer, Title Unknown, on behalf of General Counsel. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Case Management Orders were also served along with Complaint documents. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Kuntz, William)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (see document for details) (hr)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (et)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dan Cameron Geddes, Jr.. (Kuntz, William)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dan Cameron Geddes, Jr., identifying Unitied States of America and Social Security Administration. (Kuntz, William)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dan Cameron Geddes, Jr.. (Kuntz, William)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24252198 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Dan Cameron Geddes, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney William M Kuntz added to party Dan Cameron Geddes, Jr.(pty:pla))(Kuntz, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dan Cameron Geddes, Jr. v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Cameron Geddes, Jr.
Represented By: William M Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Michael K Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?