Harpreet Singh v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: Harpreet Singh
Respondent: William Barr, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Timothy S. Robbins
Case Number: 5:2019cv01545
Filed: August 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND EMERGENCY TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) #1 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. That Respondent William Barr ; Timothy S. Robbins ; U.S. Department of Homeland Security ; and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement file Answer to the Petition not later than 10/7/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Petition part 2, #3 Petition part 3, #4 Blank Consent Form) (mba)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car)
August 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Harpreet Singh. (Thompson, Rose)
August 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody (28 USC 2241), Receipt No. 0973-24281550 for $5 filing fee, filed by Petitioner Harpreet Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Administrative Record, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 2-4) (Attorney Rose Marie Thompson added to party Harpreet Singh(pty:pet))(Thompson, Rose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harpreet Singh v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy S. Robbins
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harpreet Singh
Represented By: Rose Marie Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?