Mandeep Ghotra v. Thomas Giles et al
Petitioner: Mandeep Ghotra
Respondent: Thomas Giles, William Barr, Secretary Kevin McAleenan and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 5:2019cv01554
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO STAY CASE PENDING INTERVIEW by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, re Stipulation to Stay Case #9 . Responde nt is directed to file and serve a status report keeping the Court informed of the status of Petitioner's interview thirty (30) days from the date of this order and every thirty (30) days thereafter. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (sbou)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Interview filed by respondents William Barr, Thomas Giles, Kevin McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Interview)(Han, Chung)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondents shall have up to and including August 23, 2019, to file a response to the TRO. #7 (sbou)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Deportation #3 filed by respondents William Barr, Thomas Giles, Kevin McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Petitioner's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order)(Attorney Chung Hae Han added to party William Barr(pty:res), Attorney Chung Hae Han added to party Thomas Giles(pty:res), Attorney Chung Hae Han added to party Kevin McAleenan(pty:res))(Han, Chung)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court hereby refers Petitioner's motion for a temporary restraining order and/or a stay of removal #3 to Magistrate Judge McCormick for a report and recommendation. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Memorandum of Law is attached to the Petition. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (ghap)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Deportation filed by Petitioner Mandeep Ghotra. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law) (Shah, Nilima)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Mandeep Ghotra. (Shah, Nilima)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody (28 USC 2241), Receipt No. 0973-24289355 for $5 filing fee, filed by Petitioner Mandeep Ghotra. (Attachments: #1 Credible Fear Worksheet, #2 IJ Order) (Attorney Nilima Patel Shah added to party Mandeep Ghotra(pty:pet))(Shah, Nilima)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mandeep Ghotra v. Thomas Giles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Giles
Represented By: Chung Hae Han
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Chung Hae Han
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Chung Hae Han
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mandeep Ghotra
Represented By: Nilima Patel Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?