Armando A. Marroquin Carpio v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: Armando A Marroquin Carpio
Respondent: Sheriff Jonathon Horton and Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 5:2019cv01556
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned addressed to Armando Antonio Marroquin re Minutes (In Chambers) Order #6 . Released 09/16/19. (hr)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORAR Y RESTRAINING ORDER #5 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Petitioners Application for a Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 5) is DENIED. (SEE MINUTES FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Petitioner Armando A Marroquin Carpio. (hr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Damon A Thayer counsel for Respondent Department of Homeland Security. Adding Damon A. Thayer as counsel of record for Department of Homeland Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondent Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Damon A Thayer added to party Department of Homeland Security(pty:res))(Thayer, Damon)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION (FEDERAL CUSTODY) by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Within 14 days, Respondent shall serve and file a Notice of Appearance notifying the court of the name of the attorney who will have principal charge of the case, together with the address where the attorney may be served, and the attorney's telephone and fax number. Respondents Department of Homeland Security file Answer to the Petition not later than 11/5/2019; Jonathon Horton file Answer to the Petition not later than 11/5/2019. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 10/21/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (See Order for Further Details) (Attachments: #1 Petition) (kl)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111 Notice Re Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition) (car)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) And Request For Emergency Stay of Removal Case assigned to Judge Dean D. Pregerson and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, filed by Petitioner Armando A. Marroquin Carpio. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armando A. Marroquin Carpio v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Jonathon Horton
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Damon A Thayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Armando A Marroquin Carpio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?