Ulises Zabaleta Lanz v. Kevin McAleenan et al
Petitioner: Ulises Zabaleta Lanz
Respondent: David Marin, Gabriel Valdez, Warden, Kevin McAleenan and William Barr
Case Number: 5:2019cv01626
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 11/5/2019. Respondent requests that the action be dismissed as moot because petitioner has already received the only relief he seeks in this action, i.e., release from immigration custody. Under these circumstances, the Court orders petitioner to show cause within 21 days of the date of this order why the petition should not be dismissed without prejudice for mootness. (jm)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Margaret Ming Chen counsel for Respondents William Barr, David Marin, Kevin McAleenan, Gabriel Valdez, Warden. Adding Margaret Ming Chen as counsel of record for Respondents Kevin McAleenan, William Barr, David Marin, Gabriel Valdez, Warden for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondents Kevin McAleenan, William Barr, David Marin, Gabriel Valdez, Warden. (Attorney Margaret Ming Chen added to party William Barr(pty:res), Attorney Margaret Ming Chen added to party David Marin(pty:res), Attorney Margaret Ming Chen added to party Kevin McAleenan(pty:res), Attorney Margaret Ming Chen added to party Gabriel Valdez(pty:res), Attorney Margaret Ming Chen added to party Warden(pty:res))(Chen, Margaret)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PETITIONER'S RELEASE FROM IMMIGRATION CUSTODY filed by Respondents William Barr, David Marin, Kevin McAleenan, Gabriel Valdez, Warden. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carlos Isais, #2 Certificate of Service)(Chen, Margaret)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. that Respondent William Barr file Answer to the Petition not later than 10/15/2019; David Marin file Answer to the Petition not later than 10/15/2019; Kevin McAleenan file Answer to the Petition not later than 10/15/2019; Gabriel Valdez file Answer to the Petition not later than 10/15/2019; Warden file Answer to the Petition not later than 10/15/2019. Notice: Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 9/30/2019. (petition attached) (Attachments: #1 copy of petition) (jm)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: granting #2 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Appointment of Counsel: GOOD CAUSE APPEARING THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that DFPD David Lee Menninger is appointed to represent petitioner Ulises Zabaleta Lanz. (jm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order Appointing Federal Public Defender; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibit filed by Federal Public Defender on behalf of Petitioner Ulises Zabaleta Lanz. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241). Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm.(Filing Fee $ 5 Paid), filed by Petitioner Ulises Zabaleta Lanz. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ulises Zabaleta Lanz v. Kevin McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Marin
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Margaret Ming Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gabriel Valdez
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Margaret Ming Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Margaret Ming Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Margaret Ming Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Margaret Ming Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ulises Zabaleta Lanz
Represented By: David Lee Menninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?