Rhonda Jordan Hadden v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Rhonda Jordan Hadden
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv01738
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-1738 KES on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
October 12, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Rhonda Jordan Hadden. (Kuntz, William)
October 12, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rhonda Jordan Hadden, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 9/30/2019, answer due 1/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. DeLaRosa, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Carly Sase, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown Signer, Title Unknown, on behalf of General Counsel. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Case Management Orders were also served along with Complaint documents. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Kuntz, William)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Lynn M Harada added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Harada, Lynn)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Andrew Saul. (esa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rhonda Jordan Hadden. (Kuntz, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rhonda Jordan Hadden, identifying Unitied States of America and Social Security Administration. (Kuntz, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Rhonda Jordan Hadden. (Kuntz, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24420155 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Rhonda Jordan Hadden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney William M Kuntz added to party Rhonda Jordan Hadden(pty:pla))(Kuntz, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhonda Jordan Hadden v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Jordan Hadden
Represented By: William M Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?