Lisa Shirlene Smith v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Lisa Smith Smith
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv01740
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-1740 MRW on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
October 12, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Lisa Smith Smith. (Kuntz, William)
October 12, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa Smith Smith, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 9/30/2019, answer due 1/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. DeLaRosa, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Carly Sase, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown Signer, Title Unknown, on behalf of General Counsel. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Case Management Orders were also served along with Complaint documents. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Kuntz, William)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew Saul. re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (vm)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT Updated 7/8/2019) by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for details) (vm)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (vm)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lisa Smith Smith. (Kuntz, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lisa Smith Smith, identifying Unitied States of America and Social Security Administration. (Kuntz, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Lisa Smith Smith. (Kuntz, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Smith Smith. (Kuntz, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Lisa Smith Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney William M Kuntz added to party Lisa Smith Smith(pty:pla))(Kuntz, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisa Shirlene Smith v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Smith Smith
Represented By: William M Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?