Jorge Anderson-El et al v. Michael D Zeff et al
Plaintiff: King Abdul Mumin-El, Jorge Anderson-El and Joyce Trumpet
Defendant: Jeff Tcharavov, Stanley Middleman, Bradley Olpin Snell, Graham Holmes, Michael D Zeff, Mari Ramos, Unknown Agents of the Riverside Sheriffs Department, Freedom Mortgage Corporation and Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP
Case Number: 5:2019cv01777
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 44 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 19-56321 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #42 as to Plaintiff Jorge Anderson-El. (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 43 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to plaintiff Jorge Anderson-El, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #42 . (mat)
November 12, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Jorge Anderson-El. Appeal of Order Dismissing Case, #41 Filed On: 10/24/19; Entered On: 10/24/19; Filing fee $ 505 billed. (mat)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Dismissal by Judge R. Gary Klausner: On 9/17/2019, Anderson-El filed a request to proceed in forma pauperis. On 9/18/2019, the Court denied the request and ordered Anderson-El to pay the requisite filing fees within 30 days "or this case will be dismissed." (Order, ECF No. 10.) To date, Anderson-El has failed to pay the necessary filing fees. Accordingly, the Court DISMISSES the case without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
October 24, 2019 Filing 40 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #38 filed by Defendants Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Stanley Middleman, Jeff Tcharavov, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP. (Klein, Bradford)
October 24, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #38 filed by Defendants Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Stanley Middleman, Jeff Tcharavov, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Klein, Bradford)
October 24, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Stanley Middleman, Jeff Tcharavov, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Klein, Bradford)
October 24, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Bradley Olpin Snell. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan D. Miller, #2 Proposed Order) (Miller, Ryan)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #34 , for the following reasons: Single-spaced text at pages 4, 5, 7 and 8. LR 11-3.6. (jp)
October 23, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Bradley Olpin Snell, (Miller, Ryan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 34 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 10/24/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #36 ] - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Bradley Olpin Snell. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan D. Miller, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Ryan D Miller added to party Bradley Olpin Snell(pty:dft)) (Miller, Ryan) Modified on 10/24/2019 (jp).
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, ORDERING Proof of Ownership submitted by Plaintiff Jorge Anderson-El received on 10/09/2019 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: (1) No copy provided for judge; (20 Multiple filings need to be filed separately. (jp)
October 18, 2019 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Anderson-El, Abdul Mumin-El, re Affidavit a copy of Default Notice #30 served on 10/18/2019. (jp)
October 18, 2019 Filing 31 REQUEST for Notice of Lis Pendens filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Anderson-El, Abdul Mumin-El. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). (jp)
October 18, 2019 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Anderson-El, Abdul Mumin-El. (jp)
October 18, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE to Respondents had 5 business days to Respond to Affidavit filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Anderson-El, Abdul Mumin-El. (jp)
October 17, 2019 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #26 filed by Defendants Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Stanley Middleman. (Klein, Bradford)
October 17, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #26 filed by Defendants Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Stanley Middleman. (Klein, Bradford)
October 17, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Stanley Middleman. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service) (Klein, Bradford)
October 17, 2019 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 filed by Defendants Stanley Middleman, Jeff Tcharavov, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP. (Klein, Bradford)
October 17, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 filed by Defendants Jeff Tcharavov, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP. (Klein, Bradford)
October 17, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Stanley Middleman, Jeff Tcharavov, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Klein, Bradford)
October 17, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 filed by Defendants Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Stanley Middleman, Jeff Tcharavov, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP. (Klein, Bradford)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 , for the following reasons: Memorandum of Points and Authorities contains single-spaced text. LR 11-3.6. Counsel may refile the motion by 12 noon on October 18, 2019. (jp)
October 17, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 filed by Defendants Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Stanley Middleman, Jeff Tcharavov, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP. (Klein, Bradford)
October 17, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 filed by Defendants Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Stanley Middleman, Jeff Tcharavov, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP. (Klein, Bradford)
October 16, 2019 Filing 18 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 10/17/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #21 ] - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Stanley Middleman, Jeff Tcharavov, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Affidavit Certificate of Service) (Klein, Bradford) Modified on 10/17/2019 (jp).
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Stanley Middleman, Jeff Tcharavov, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP, (Klein, Bradford)
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bradford E Klein on behalf of Defendants Stanley Middleman, Jeff Tcharavov, Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP (Attorney Bradford E Klein added to party Stanley Middleman(pty:dft), Attorney Bradford E Klein added to party Jeff Tcharavov(pty:dft), Attorney Bradford E Klein added to party Freedom Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Bradford E Klein added to party Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP(pty:dft))(Klein, Bradford)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner ORDERING Notice of Dishonor of Tender of Presentation submitted by Plaintiff Jorge Anderson-El received on 10/3/19 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (lc)
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DISHONOR OF TENDER OF PRESENTMENT filed by plaintiff Jorge Anderson-El. (lc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL on 9/17/19 re Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Anderson-El, Joyce Trumpet. (lom)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint #11 as to Defendants Graham Holmes, Stanley Middleman, Mari Ramos, Bradley Olpin Snell, Jeff Tcharavov, Michael D Zeff. (lom)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT #1 against Defendants Graham Holmes, Stanley Middleman, Mari Ramos, Bradley Olpin Snell, Jeff Tcharavov, Unknown Agents of the Riverside Sheriffs Department, Michael D Zeff filed by Plaintiffs Joyce Trumpet, Jorge Anderson-El. (Attachments: #1 [Prop] Order)(lom)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge R. Gary Klausner that the request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 is hereby DENIED. IT IS RECOMMENDED by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for the following reasons: (1) Inadquate showing of indigency. (2) Legally and/or factually patently frivolous. Plaintiff Anderson-El claims to own a home valued at $348,000. Anderson-El also alleges in the complaint that he paid a $316.85 filing fee in state court on 8/29/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff SHALL PAY THE FILING FEES IN FULL within 30 days or this case will be dismissed. (jp)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order [DE 3] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application #3 . (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-1777 RGK (SPx). (esa)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Jorge Anderson-El. (car)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #3 filed by Plaintiff Jorge Anderson-El. (car)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Jorge Anderson-El. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (car)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jorge Anderson-El (car)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION COMPLAINT against Defendants. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Anderson-El, Abdul Mumin-El, Joyce Trumpet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jorge Anderson-El et al v. Michael D Zeff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Abdul Mumin-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Anderson-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Trumpet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Tcharavov
Represented By: Bradford E Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Middleman
Represented By: Bradford E Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Olpin Snell
Represented By: Ryan D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Zeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mari Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Agents of the Riverside Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Bradford E Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP
Represented By: Bradford E Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?