Ramos Navas v. McAleenan et al
Petitioner: Mario Dusstin Ramos Navas
Respondent: David Marin, Gabriela Valdez, Warden, Kevin McAleenan and William Barr
Case Number: 5:2019cv01778
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Respondent's Answer #7 filed by Petitioner Mario Dusstin Ramos Navas.(ec)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE filed by Respondents William Barr, Kevin McAleenanto Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #1 (Yang, Jasmin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jasmin Yang on behalf of Respondents William Barr, Kevin McAleenan (Attorney Jasmin Yang added to party William Barr(pty:res), Attorney Jasmin Yang added to party Kevin McAleenan(pty:res))(Yang, Jasmin)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: granting #4 Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. Insofar as the Request seeks an after-the-fact waiver of the filing fee for this action, it is GRANTED in that respect only. (ec)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Petitioner Mario Dusstin Ramos Navas. (ec)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. that Respondent Kevin McAleenan file Answer to the Petition not later than 10/23/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Blank Consent form) (ec)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111) (lh)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241); Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish.(Filing Fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Mario Dusstin Ramos Navas. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos Navas v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Marin
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gabriela Valdez
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jasmin Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jasmin Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mario Dusstin Ramos Navas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?