Extang Corporation et al v. Tyger Auto Inc.
Plaintiff: Extang Corporation, Laurmark Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a BAK Industries and Laurmark Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Tyger Auto Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv02074
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: S James Otero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/10/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
December 6, 2019 Filing 24 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cristina Q. Almendarez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Tyger Auto Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 11/25/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24842977) filed by Defendant Tyger Auto Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lukas, Edward)
December 4, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cristina Q. Almendarez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Tyger Auto Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24842977) #19 by Judge S. James Otero. The document is stricken. Comply with Notice of deficiency #20 . (lc)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Leigh C. Taggart to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Tyger Auto Inc. and designating Edward W. Lukas, Jr. as local counsel #18 by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher E. Hanba to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Tyger Auto Inc and designating Edward W. Lukas, Jr. as local counsel #17 by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cristina Q. Almendarez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Tyger Auto Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24842977) #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt)
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 [STRICKEN PER COURTS 12/4/19 G112B RESPONSE ORDER, DOCKET NO. 23] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cristina Q. Almendarez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Tyger Auto Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24842977) filed by Defendant Tyger Auto Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lukas, Edward) Modified on 12/5/2019 (lc).
November 25, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Leigh C. Taggart to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Tyger Auto Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24842942) filed by Defendant Tyger Auto Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lukas, Edward)
November 25, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher E. Hanba to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Tyger Auto Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24842838) filed by Defendant Tyger Auto Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lukas, Edward)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tyger Auto Inc., (Lukas, Edward)
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Tyger Auto Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Attorney Edward W Lukas, Jr added to party Tyger Auto Inc.(pty:dft))(Lukas, Edward)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Extang Corporation, Laurmark Enterprises, Inc., upon Defendant Tyger Auto Inc. served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Weisong Chen, Agent for Service of Process of Tyger Auto, Inc., John Chen, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entitya.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cole, William)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Henrik J. Redway to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Extang Corporation, Laurmark Enterprises, Inc. and designating William P Cole as local counsel #11 by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Henrik J. Redway to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Extang Corporation, Laurmark Enterprises, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24740038) filed by plaintiffs Extang Corporation, Laurmark Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cole, William)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to Judge S. James Otero for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 5:19-cv-02074-SJO-SHKx. (aco)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney H Jonathan Redway. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Tyger Auto Inc. (ghap)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Extang Corporation, Laurmark Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a BAK Industries, identifying Truck Hero, Inc.; Tectum Holdings, Inc.. (Caloiaro, Steven)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Extang Corporation, Laurmark Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a BAK Industries. (Caloiaro, Steven)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Extang Corporation, Laurmark Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a BAK Industries. (Caloiaro, Steven)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Extang Corporation, Laurmark Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a BAK Industries. (Caloiaro, Steven)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24694330 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Extang Corporation, Laurmark Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a BAK Industries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Steven A Caloiaro added to party Extang Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Steven A Caloiaro added to party Laurmark Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a BAK Industries(pty:pla))(Caloiaro, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Extang Corporation et al v. Tyger Auto Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Extang Corporation
Represented By: Steven A Caloiaro
Represented By: William P Cole
Represented By: H Jonathan Redway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurmark Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a BAK Industries
Represented By: Steven A Caloiaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurmark Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A Caloiaro
Represented By: William P Cole
Represented By: H Jonathan Redway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyger Auto Inc.
Represented By: Leigh C Taggart
Represented By: Cristina Q Almendarez
Represented By: Christopher E Hanba
Represented By: Edward W Lukas, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?