Anthony Mendoza v. National Distribution Centers LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Mendoza
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive, NFI Industries, Inc. and National Distribution Centers LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv02084
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #10 Non-Resident Attorney Sarah R. Doty APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of National Distribution Centers LLC, Defendant, designating Ellen E. Boshkoff as local counsel. (twdb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sarah R. Doty to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant National Distribution Centers LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24978693) filed by defendant National Distribution Centers LLC. (Boshkoff, Ellen)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant National Distribution Centers LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 served on 11/20/2019. (Boshkoff, Ellen)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
October 30, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant National Distribution Centers LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/29/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
October 30, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, National Distribution Centers LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Anthony Mendoza. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/27/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) Modified on 11/1/2019 (ghap).
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant NFI Industries, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on 10/30/2019. (Boshkoff, Ellen)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant NFI Industries, Inc., identifying National Distribution Centers LLC, NFI, L.P.. (Boshkoff, Ellen)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant NFI Industries, Inc.. (Boshkoff, Ellen)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVDS1928739 Receipt No: 0973-24701317 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant NFI Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint, #3 Declaration of Krista Gallagher, #4 Declaration of Sarah E. Pontoski) (Attorney Ellen E Boshkoff added to party NFI Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Boshkoff, Ellen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Mendoza v. National Distribution Centers LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFI Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Ellen E Boshkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Distribution Centers LLC
Represented By: Sarah R Doty
Represented By: Ellen E Boshkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Mendoza
Represented By: Raymond Babaian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?