Kimberly Ann Masterson v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ann Masterson
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv02114
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kimberly Ann Masterson, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Front desk/Reception. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Front desk/reception. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 summons executed with proof of service)(Ortega, Omar)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Tina Naicker added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Naicker, Tina)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (jdo)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (jdo)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Kimberly Ann Masterson. (Ortega, Omar)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Kimberly Ann Masterson, (Ortega, Omar)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Kimberly Ann Masterson. (Ortega, Omar)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Ann Masterson. (Ortega, Omar)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff Kimberly Ann Masterson. (Attorney Omar Ortega added to party Kimberly Ann Masterson(pty:pla))(Ortega, Omar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimberly Ann Masterson v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ann Masterson
Represented By: Omar Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?