Henry Smith v. Reoice, et al.
Petitioner: Henry Tom Smith
Respondent: Officer Deumas and Sgt. Reoice
Case Number: 5:2019cv02131
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 . Based upon the deficiencies identified above, the Complaint appears subject to dismissal. Accordingly, if Plaintiff still desires to pursue this action he shall, within 30 days from the date of this Order either:(see document for details). (Attachments: #1 Blank Civil Rights Complaint) (mba)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
November 5, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Henry Smith. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the Central District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/4/19. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
October 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #1 Complaint served on Henry Smith. (Lundstrom, T) [Transferred from California Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Lundstrom, T) [Transferred from California Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Henry Smith. (Lundstrom, T) [Transferred from California Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Deumas and Reoice by Henry Smith.(Lundstrom, T) [Transferred from California Eastern on 11/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry Smith v. Reoice, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Officer Deumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sgt. Reoice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Henry Tom Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?