Hanna Rhee v. Dev Appannagari Gnanadev
Plaintiff: Hanna Rhee
Defendant: Dev Appannagari Gnanadev
Case Number: 5:2019cv02223
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY Opposition MTD, MTS filed by Plaintiff Hanna Rhee. (Rhee, Hanna)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND STRIKE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: deferring ruling on #25 MOTION to Dismiss Case ; deferring ruling on #26 MOTION. The hearing noticed for October 6, 2020 is hereby VACATED and the matter taken off calendar. 2.) Plaintiff Hanna Rhees (Plaintiffs) opposition, or notice of non-opposition, to the Motions must be served and filed on or before September 24, 2020. An opposition should be limited to issues raised in the MTD. (dc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Allegations from Complaint Complaint - (Referred) #2 filed by Defendant Dev Appannagari Gnanadev. Motion set for hearing on 10/6/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Lo, Amy)
August 28, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Dev Appannagari Gnanadev. Motion set for hearing on 10/6/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Lo, Amy)
July 27, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OFFER FOR MEDIATION filed by PRO SE PLAINTIFF Hanna Rhee. OF BLACK PATIENTS MATTER (Rhee, Hanna)
July 2, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Hanna Rhee. upon Dev Appannagari Gnanadev waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/29/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Attorney Amy Lo. (Rhee, Hanna)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FORDEFAULT JUDGMENT [ECF NO. 15], GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRYOF DEFAULT [ECF NO. 18], AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR CONSIDERATION[ECF NO. 17] by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Accordingly, for the foregoing reasons, the Court (1) DENIES Plaintiffs Motion forDefault, (2) DENIES Plaintiff's Request for Consideration, and (3) GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default. The Court also GRANTS Plaintiff an additional opportunity to properly serve Defendant. Plaintiff is ORDERED to meet and confer with Defendant in accordance with L.R. 7-3 to ensure proper compliance with the rules of service and to serve Defendant by July 3, 2020. (dc)
June 22, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #14 . #18 filed by Defendant Dev Appannagari Gnanadev. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supp. of Counsel)(Lo, Amy)
June 15, 2020 Filing 20 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #14 . #18 filed by Plaintiff Hanna Rhee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jacks Psych Eval)(Rhee, Hanna)
June 5, 2020 Filing 19 No response WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Pro Se Plaintiff Hanna Rhee. upon Dev Appannagari Gnanadev waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit GnanaDev mailing address, #2 Exhibit USPS tracking)(Rhee, Hanna)
June 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #14 . filed by Defendant Dev Appannagari Gnanadev. Motion set for hearing on 7/7/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration) (Lo, Amy)
June 3, 2020 Filing 17 REQUEST MOTION for Consideration of Parties to file all communications with Court filed by Pro Se Plaintiff Hanna Rhee. (Rhee, Hanna)
June 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy W Lo on behalf of Defendant Dev Appannagari Gnanadev (Attorney Amy W Lo added to party Dev Appannagari Gnanadev(pty:dft))(Lo, Amy)
June 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant DEV APPANNAGARI GNANADEV filed by Plaintiff Pro Se Hanna Rhee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiff Pro Se Affidavit for Motion Default Judgment) (Rhee, Hanna)
June 2, 2020 Filing 14 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Dev Appannagari Gnanadev (hr)
June 2, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Pro Se Hanna Rhee, re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #9 , APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Dev Appannagari Gnanadev #12 , Response #11 served on June 02, 2020. (Rhee, Hanna)
June 2, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Dev Appannagari Gnanadev filed by Plaintiff Pro Se Hanna Rhee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service for Request for Clerk Entry of Default, #2 Affidavit Affidavit for Request Clerk Entry of Default) (Rhee, Hanna)
June 1, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Hanna Rhee Hanna Rhee of Black Patients Matter (Rhee, Hanna)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/3/2020. (dc)
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hanna Rhee, upon Defendant Dev Appannagari Gnanadev served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kerrie Webb, Attorney, Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed. Original Summons NOT returned. (hr)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: granting #5 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.1.1, the applicant must register to use the Court's CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Court's website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (hr)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL CIVIL RIGHTS CASE upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (dc)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Hanna Rhee. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Order Re Application for Permission for Electronic Filing) (ghap)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Hanna Rhee. (ghap)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred) #2 as to Defendant Dev Appannagari Gnanadev. (ghap)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Dev Appannagari Gnanadev Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H Kewalramani.(Filing fee$400:PAID), filed by plaintiff Hanna Rhee. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (ghap)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH LODGING OF COMPLAINT mailed to Plaintiff Hanna Rhee. Upon submission of your complaint, the following discrepancy was found: You have submitted a personal check. Please be advised that personal checks are not accepted. Your check will be returned to you by our Fiscal Department. Please send a cashiers check or money order instead. Be sure to reference the civil case number on your payment. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your your action will be dismissed. If your fee waiver request or payment is received within THIRTY DAYS, judges will be assigned to your case. You may return your fee waiver request or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. Re Lodged Complaint (ghap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2019: #1 CV-71, #2 Summons, #3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, #4 Application for Permission for Electronic Filing, #5 Order Re Application for Permission For Electronic Filing, #6 Lodged Complaint) (ghap).
November 20, 2019 LODGED COMPLAINT sought to be filed by Plaintiff Hanna Rhee. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanna Rhee v. Dev Appannagari Gnanadev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dev Appannagari Gnanadev
Represented By: Amy W Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanna Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?