Jason Hodges v. Evertek Computer Corporation
Plaintiff: Jason Hodges
Defendant: Evertek Computer Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv02247
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Waiver of Service Executed #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): pdf document MISSING case number. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Jason Hodges. upon Evertek Computer Corporation waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Frank Segler. (Lawler, Brian)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing onthe voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents (lc)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing onthe voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Evertek Computer Corporation. (esa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons filed by Plaintiff Jason Hodges. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Summons)(Lawler, Brian)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jason Hodges. (Lawler, Brian)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jason Hodges. (Lawler, Brian)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jason Hodges. (Lawler, Brian)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Fee Exemption in accordance with statute, filed by Plaintiff Jason Hodges. (Attorney Brian Joseph Lawler added to party Jason Hodges(pty:pla))(Lawler, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jason Hodges v. Evertek Computer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evertek Computer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Hodges
Represented By: Brian Joseph Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?