Shad Fenton Beauprez v. City of Palm Springs
Plaintiff: Shad Fenton (Beauprez) and Shad Fenton Beauprez
Defendant: City of Palm Springs, California, City Manager David Ready, City of Palm Springs and Gilbert Estrada
Case Number: 5:2019cv02320
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 22 Mail Returned addressed to Shad Fenton Beauprez re Order to Show Cause #19 (mrgo)
February 11, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant City of Palm Springs.(Lomakin, Jessica)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 2/20/2020. (et)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION TO SUBMIT SAC, MOTION TO SUBMIT DECLARATION OF FENTON BEAUPREZ filed by plaintiff #17 - The motion is granted. The Second Amended Complaint is deemed filed as of 01/22/2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 22, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION TO SUBMIT SAC, MOTION TO SUBMIT DECLARATION OF FENTON BEAUPREZ filed by plaintiff Shad Fenton Beauprez. (mrgo)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE; and #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case [FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT] filed by Defendant - Pursuant to Local Rule 7-12, the Court deems Plaintiffs failure to file an Opposition in a timely manner to constitute consent to Defendants motion to dismiss #12 . Defendants motion to dismiss is GRANTED. In repleading, Plaintiff should specify which civil rights were violated by the City and how. Failure to properly amend the complaint may result in dismissal with prejudice. Plaintiff has 21 days to file an amended complaint in this matter. The conference and motion hearing previously scheduled for 01/27/2020 at 1:30 p.m. are vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case [FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT] #12 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #9 Notice of No Opposition Filed or Received filed by Defendant City of Palm Springs. (Lomakin, Jessica)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant City of Palm Springs, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #8 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #10 , Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case [FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT] #12 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form, #11 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #9 POS RE SERVICE ON FENTON COURT DOC NOS. 7 TO 12.2 served on 12/23/2019. (Lomakin, Jessica)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 SCHEDULING NOTICE: The Initial Status Conference previously scheduled for 02/03/2020 at 3:00 p.m. has been rescheduled to 1/27/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case [FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT] filed by Defendant City of Palm Springs. Motion set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica K. Lomakin, #2 Proposed Order) (Lomakin, Jessica)
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #9 by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by. (yl)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DE #11 ** NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant City of Palm Springs. Motion set for hearing on 1/6/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica K. Lomakin, #2 Proposed Order) (Lomakin, Jessica) Modified on 12/13/2019 (yl).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 2/3/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant City of Palm Springs, Re Notice to Adverse Party/State of Removal Action to Federal Court served on 12.6.2019. (Lomakin, Jessica)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-02320 SVW (KKx). (lh)
December 4, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants City of Palm Springs, Gilbert Estrada, David Ready. filed by Defendants Shad Fenton Beauprez. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/16/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant City of Palm Springs, California. (Lomakin, Jessica)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant City of Palm Springs, California, (Lomakin, Jessica)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside, case number RIC1904631, Receipt No: 0973-24890164 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant City of Palm Springs, California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Ex. B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Ex. C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Ex. D to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Jessica K Lomakin added to party City of Palm Springs, California(pty:dft))(Lomakin, Jessica) Modified on 12/5/2019 (lh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shad Fenton Beauprez v. City of Palm Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Palm Springs, California
Represented By: Jessica K Lomakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Manager David Ready
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Palm Springs
Represented By: Richard T Egger
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Ballinger
Represented By: Jessica K Lomakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shad Fenton (Beauprez)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shad Fenton Beauprez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?