Donald J Peel v. Jusino
Case Number: 5:2020cv00287
Filed: February 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Eastern Division - Riverside Office
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV38) (esa)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
February 12, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Donald J. Peel. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/12/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/11/2020 ORDERING CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/12/2020.]
February 7, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Donald J. Peel. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/12/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/12/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Donald J. Peel. (Coll, A) Modified on 2/10/2020 (Plummer, M). [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/12/2020.] Modified on 2/12/2020 (esa).
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 2241 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Jusino by Donald J. Peel.(Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/12/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donald J Peel v. Jusino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?