Lori Myers v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Lori Myers
Defendant: STARBUCKS CORPORATION, a Washington corporation, dba, Starbucks #6849, Mars, Inc., The Quaker Oats Company, Does 1-10, inclusive and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 5:2020cv00335
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT TO APRIL 24, 2020 #25 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Defendant The Quaker Oats Company to answer or otherwise respond to thecomplaint on file is hereby extended through and including April 24, 2020 (et)
March 30, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 04/24/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Quaker Oats Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jura, Perlette)
March 19, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice to Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 19, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #21 , Notice (Other) #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 13, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Perlette Michele Jura on behalf of Defendant The Quaker Oats Company (Attorney Perlette Michele Jura added to party The Quaker Oats Company(pty:dft))(Jura, Perlette)
March 13, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance of Abby H. Meyer on Behalf of Defendant Starbucks Corporation filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Meyer, Abby)
March 13, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance of Robert J. Guite on Behalf of Defendant Starbucks Corporation filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Guite, Robert)
March 13, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sascha V M Henry on behalf of Defendant Starbucks Corporation (Attorney Sascha V M Henry added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Henry, Sascha)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #15 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS ORDERED THAT the deadline of Defendants Mars, Incorporated and Starbucks Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on file is hereby extended through and including April 24, 2020. (et)
March 12, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Lori Myers. correcting Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #9 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #10 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #8 (Zeldes, Helen)
March 12, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mars, Inc., (Horniak, David)
March 12, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 24, 2020 filed by Defendant Mars, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Horniak, David)
March 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Michael Horniak on behalf of Defendant Mars, Inc. (Attorney David Michael Horniak added to party Mars, Inc.(pty:dft))(Horniak, David)
March 12, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Quaker Oats Company answer now due 4/15/2020, re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #10 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Quaker Oats Company.(Tulumello, Andrew)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Quaker Oats Company, identifying PepsiCo, Inc.. (Tulumello, Andrew)
March 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew S Tulumello on behalf of Defendant The Quaker Oats Company (Attorney Andrew S Tulumello added to party The Quaker Oats Company(pty:dft))(Tulumello, Andrew)
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Lori Myers, upon Defendant The Quaker Oats Company served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Zeldes, Helen)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Lori Myers, upon Defendant Mars, Inc. served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Zeldes, Helen)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Lori Myers, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Zeldes, Helen)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-00335 CJC(SHKx). (rn)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Terrence P Collingsworth. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Mars, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, The Quaker Oats Company. (car)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintff Lori Myers. (Zeldes, Helen)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lori Myers. (Zeldes, Helen)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-25410818 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lori Myers. (Attorney Helen I Zeldes added to party Lori Myers(pty:pla))(Zeldes, Helen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lori Myers v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARBUCKS CORPORATION, a Washington corporation, dba, Starbucks #6849
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mars, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Horniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Quaker Oats Company
Represented By: Andrew S Tulumello
Represented By: Perlette Michele Jura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Sascha V M Henry
Represented By: Abby Hess Meyer
Represented By: Robert James Guite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Myers
Represented By: Helen I Zeldes
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Sweetser
Represented By: John Clay Washington
Represented By: Paul L Hoffman
Represented By: Ben Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?