Saul Ricks v. Josie Gastelo
Petitioner: Saul Ricks
Respondent: Josie Gastelo
Case Number: 5:2020cv00394
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jennifer A Jadovitz on behalf of Respondent Josie Gastelo (Attorney Jennifer A Jadovitz added to party Josie Gastelo(pty:res))(Jadovitz, Jennifer)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. that Respondent Josie Gastelo file Answer to the Petition not later than 5/4/2020. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 4/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Blank Consent Form) (efc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: denying #2 Request for Appointment of Counsel. (efc)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111 and CV-69) (ghap)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel in a Federal Habeas Corpus Case. filed by petitioner Saul Ricks. (ghap)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish.(Filing fee $ 5: FEE DUE.), filed by petitioner Saul Ricks. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saul Ricks v. Josie Gastelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Saul Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Josie Gastelo
Represented By: Jennifer A Jadovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?