Delta T LLC v. MacroAir Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Delta T LLC and Delta T LLC doing business as Big Ass Fans
Defendant: MacroAir Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00728
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:20-cv-00728 GW(GJSx). (rn)
June 4, 2020 Filing 18 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Delta T LLC. (Virgien, Kyle)
May 11, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to MacroAir Technologies, Inc. answer now due 6/15/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant MacroAir Technologies, Inc..(Attorney Stephen M Lobbin added to party MacroAir Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lobbin, Stephen)
April 24, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Delta T LLC, upon Defendant MacroAir Technologies, Inc. served on 4/23/2020, answer due 5/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jaylin Krell, authorized agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Virgien, Kyle)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Clement J. Naples' APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Delta T LLC, designating Thomas W. Yeh as local counsel. (hr)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: granting #7 Non-Resident Attorney Surendra K. Ravula's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Delta T LLC, designating Thomas W. Yeh as local counsel. (hr)
April 14, 2020 Filing 13 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (dts)
April 9, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Clement J. Naples to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Delta T LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26034578) filed by Plaintiff Delta T LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Clement J. Naples, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order) (Yeh, Thomas)
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Clement J. Naples. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant MacroAir Technologies, Inc. (car)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (car)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Delta T LLC. (Yeh, Thomas)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Surendra K. Ravula to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Delta T LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26021713) filed by Plaintiff Delta T LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Yeh, Thomas)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kyle A Virgien counsel for Plaintiff Delta T LLC. Adding Kyle A. Virgien as counsel of record for Delta T LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Delta T LLC. (Virgien, Kyle)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas W Yeh counsel for Plaintiff Delta T LLC. Adding Thomas W. Yeh as counsel of record for Delta T LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Delta T LLC. (Yeh, Thomas)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Delta T LLC, identifying Delta T LLC d/b/a Big Ass Fans, Big Ass Holding, LLC, Goldberg Lindsay & Co., LLC a/k/a Lindsay Goldberg and MacroAir Technologies, Inc.. (Attorney Thomas W Yeh added to party Delta T LLC(pty:pla))(Yeh, Thomas)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Delta T LLC. (Yeh, Thomas)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Delta T LLC. (Yeh, Thomas)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26021092 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Delta T LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Kyle A Virgien added to party Delta T LLC(pty:pla))(Virgien, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta T LLC v. MacroAir Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta T LLC
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Thomas W Yeh
Represented By: Clement J Naples
Represented By: Surendra K Ravula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta T LLC doing business as Big Ass Fans
Represented By: Kyle A Virgien
Represented By: Thomas W Yeh
Represented By: Clement J Naples
Represented By: Surendra K Ravula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacroAir Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M Lobbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?