Russel Casio Bernardino et al v. William P Barr et al
Petitioner: Russell Casio Bernardino and Victor Noel Diaz Gomez
Respondent: GEO Group Inc., GEO Sec. Ser. and William P Barr
Case Number: 5:2020cv00740
Filed: April 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: DENYING #10 Requesting to life the stay. (shb)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. The Court has considered the evidence and arguments presented in favor of and against Petitioners petition for a writ of habeas corpus. The Court will combine the evidentiary hearing on Petitioners petition for a writ of habeas corpus with a court trial on Petitioners claims for injunctive and declaratory relief. Each side will be allowed 8 hours to present their case. The time limit includes all aspects of the case, including opening statements, direct and cross examinations, arguments on objections, and closing arguments. In lieu of closing arguments, the parties may file closing briefs, of no more than 25 pages, no later than ten days after the conclusion of the evidentiary hearing and trial. The following dates are subject to change by the Court in response to the COVID-19 pandemic; at this time, it is unclear as to when the First Street Courthouse will re-open for evidentiary hearings and court trials for civil cases. Discovery cut-off 7/31/2020., Substantive Motion Filing Deadline by 8/10/2020., Motions in Limine Filing Deadline filed by 8/27/2020., Evidentiary Hearing and Court Trial set for 10/6/2020 at 10:00 AM., Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 10:00 a.m. While the Ninth Circuit has not yet reached the issue, it is clear to the Court that it has the inherent authority, at least in extraordinary cases, to release detainees on bail during the pendency of their habeas petitions. See order for further details. DOCKETED IN THIS CASE PER PAGE ATTACHMENT. (jp)
May 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - select Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests - select Order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 OPPOSITION Federal Respondents Opposition To Russell Cosio Bernardino Request To Lift Stay filed by Respondent William P Barr. (Quist, Sarah)
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 Petitioner's Request to Lift Stay Order (Rivera, Gabriela) Modified on 5/28/2020 (shb).
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STAY ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr.: Petitioner is a member of the provisionally certified class in Roman. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that pending a final resolution of Roman, this case be, and hereby is, STAYED. (shb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of Deputy Public Defender Gabriela Rivera on behalf of Plaintiff Russell Casio Bernardino. Filed by Plaintiff Russell Casio Bernardino. (Attorney Gabriela Rivera added to party Russell Casio Bernardino(pty:pet))(Rivera, Gabriela)
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. The document attached is a Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel and not a Proof of Service In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Respondent William P Barr, re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #5 Amended Proof of Service served on 4/14/2020. (Quist, Sarah)
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sarah M S Quist counsel for Respondent William P Barr. Adding Sarah Quist as counsel of record for William P. Barr for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondent William P. Barr. (Attorney Sarah M S Quist added to party William P Barr(pty:res))(Quist, Sarah)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR.,United States District Judge. Respondents are to file their opposition to the Temporary Restraining Order by no later than 5 pm, Tuesday, April 14, 2020. (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (pj)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Counsel are hereby notified that pursuant to the Judge's directive, the The Federal Public Defender is appointed to represent both the Petitioners in this case. The Federal Public Defender shall file an amended petition and amended application for Temporary Restraining Order on behalf Petitioner Russell Casio Bernardino. The claims of Petitioner Victor Noel Diaz Gomez are dismissed without prejudice. Each Adelanto related habeas petition shall be limited to a single petitioner. The Federal Public Defender shall file a new petition and application for a Temporary Restraining Orders on behalf of Gomez in a new case. (jp)
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111) (lh)
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Supplement Emergency Petition for Extraordinary Circumstances, Temporary Restraining Order. Case assigned to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott.(Filing Fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioners Russell Casio Bernardino, Victor Noel Diaz Gomez. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russel Casio Bernardino et al v. William P Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GEO Group Inc.
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GEO Sec. Ser.
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Sarah M S Quist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Russell Casio Bernardino
Represented By: Gabriela Rivera
Represented By: Federal Public Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Victor Noel Diaz Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?