Steve Sfera v. Chad T. Wolf
Petitioner: Steve Sfera
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence, James Janecka, David A. Marin and Chad T. Wolf
Case Number: 5:2020cv00741
Filed: April 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. The Court has considered the evidence and arguments presented in favor of and against Petitioners petition for a writ of habeas corpus. The Court will combine the evidentiary hearing on Petitioners petition for a writ of habeas corpus with a court trial on Petitioners claims for injunctive and declaratory relief. Each side will be allowed 8 hours to present their case. The time limit includes all aspects of the case, including opening statements, direct and cross examinations, arguments on objections, and closing arguments. In lieu of closing arguments, the parties may file closing briefs, of no more than 25 pages, no later than ten days after the conclusion of the evidentiary hearing and trial. The following dates are subject to change by the Court in response to the COVID-19 pandemic; at this time, it is unclear as to when the First Street Courthouse will re-open for evidentiary hearings and court trials for civil cases. Discovery cut-off 7/31/2020., Substantive Motion Filing Deadline by 8/10/2020., Motions in Limine Filing Deadline filed by 8/27/2020., Evidentiary Hearing and Court Trial set for 10/6/2020 at 10:00 AM., Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 10:00 a.m. While the Ninth Circuit has not yet reached the issue, it is clear to the Court that it has the inherent authority, at least in extraordinary cases, to release detainees on bail during the pendency of their habeas petitions. See order for further details. DOCKETED IN THIS CASE PER PAGE ATTACHMENT. (jp)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STAY ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr.: It is Ordered that, pursuant to the Preliminary Injunction issued in Roman, Petitioner shall remain released pending a final resolution of Roman or further order of the Court. It is further Ordered that pending a final resolution of Roman, this case be, and hereby is, Stayed. (shb)
April 24, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF EXHIBIT F filed by Petitioner Steve Sfera. (Olin, Adam)
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Respondents Matthew T. Albence, David A. Marin, Chad T. Wolfto Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) #1 , APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Forthwith Release #2 , Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #10 RESPONSE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED; DECLARATIONS OF GABRIEL VALDEZ AND JUAN GUTIERREZ (mj) (Attachments: #1 Declaration s)(Kollitz, Aaron)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: (pj)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #8 filed by Respondents Matthew T. Albence, David A. Marin, Chad T. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit A)(Kollitz, Aaron)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 OPPOSITION re: APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Forthwith Release #2 filed by Respondents Matthew T. Albence, David A. Marin, Chad T. Wolf. (Kollitz, Aaron)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, #3 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Granting #3 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Appointment of Counsel Appointed Adam Olin for Steve Sfera. (shb)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Respondents are to file their opposition to the Temporary Restraining Order by no later than 5 pm, Monday, April 13, 2020. (shb)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron Kollitz counsel for Respondents Matthew T. Albence, David A. Marin, Chad T. Wolf. Adding Aaron Kollitz as counsel of record for Respondents CHAD T. WOLF, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security; MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Deputy Director and Senior Official Performing Duties of the Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement; DAVID A. MARIN, Field Office Director for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondents Respondents CHAD T. WOLF, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security; MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Deputy Director and Senior Official Performing Duties of the Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement; DAVID A. MARIN, Field Office Director. (Attorney Aaron Kollitz added to party Matthew T. Albence(pty:res), Attorney Aaron Kollitz added to party David A. Marin(pty:res), Attorney Aaron Kollitz added to party Chad T. Wolf(pty:res))(Kollitz, Aaron)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (jtil)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Petitioner Steve Sfera. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (jtil)
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Forthwith Release filed by Petitioner Steve Sfera. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (jtil)
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241), filed by Petitioner Steve Sfera. Case assigned to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (Filing fee $ 5 Paid.) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steve Sfera v. Chad T. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steve Sfera
Represented By: Amy M Karlin
Represented By: Adam Olin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Aaron Kollitz
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Janecka
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David A. Marin
Represented By: Aaron Kollitz
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad T. Wolf
Represented By: Aaron Kollitz
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?