Wendy Gish et al v. Gavin Newsom et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs are parishioners or pastors at three Southern California churches: Shield of Faith Family Church (Fontana, CA), Church Unlimited (Indio, CA) and Word of Life Ministries International, Inc. (Riverside, CA). They have sued Governor Gavin Newsom, AG Xavier Becerra and various officials from San Bernardino County and Riverside County alleging that the State Executive Order N-33-20 and local county health officer orders violate the Establishment Clause, the Free Exercise Clause and the Freedom of Assembly Clause of the First Amendment because they are not narrowly tailored to further a compelling governmental interest.

Plaintiff: Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, Brenda Wood and James Dean Moffatt
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, John McMahon, Chuck Washington, Karen Spiegel, Chad Bianco, Curt Hagman, Janice Rutherford, Josie Gonzalez, Cameron Kaiser, George Johnson, Jeff Hewitt, Robert Lovinggood, Dawn Rowe, Erin Gustafson, Gavin Christopher Newsom, Kevin Jeffries, V. Manuel Perez, Gavin Newsom, County of San Bernardino and Josie Gonzales
Case Number: 5:2020cv00755
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 71 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #67 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Grabarsky, Todd)
May 28, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Jeff Hewitt, Kevin Jeffries, Karen Spiegel, Chad Bianco, George Johnson, Cameron Kaiser, V. Manuel Perez, Chuck Washington #66 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-6 Memorandum/brief exceeds 25 pages. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ad)
May 27, 2020 Filing 69 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #67 filed by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Certificate of Service)(Grabarsky, Todd)
May 27, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Josie Gonzales, Erin Gustafson, Curt Hagman, Robert Lovinggood, John McMahon, Dawn Rowe, Janice Rutherford. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to RFJN) (Fox, Deborah)
May 27, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Grabarsky, Todd)
May 27, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Jeff Hewitt, Kevin Jeffries, Karen Spiegel, Chad Bianco, George Johnson, Cameron Kaiser, V. Manuel Perez, Chuck Washington filed by Defendants Jeff Hewitt, Kevin Jeffries, Karen Spiegel, Chad Bianco, George Johnson, Cameron Kaiser, V. Manuel Perez, Chuck Washington. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order) (Patel, Ronak)
May 20, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/22/20 re Transcript #64 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Preston, Phyllis) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 20, 2020 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/22/20. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2020. (Preston, Phyllis)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #52 filed by Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood. CCA # 20-55445.The Clerk shall file the amicus brief submitted by Americans United for Separation of Church and State on May 5, 2020. Appellants emergency motion for an injunction pending appeal is denied. Appellants alternative motion to expedite the briefing and hearing of this appeal is denied. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect.(lc)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation #61 . Defendants' response to the Complaint shall be served and filed on or before May 27, 2020. (twdb)
April 30, 2020 Filing 61 Joint STIPULATION for Order Consolidating Deadlines for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint filed by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Grabarsky, Todd)
April 29, 2020 Filing 60 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 2055445, as to Defendants Josie Gonzales, Erin Gustafson, Curt Hagman, Robert Lovinggood, John McMahon, Dawn Rowe, Janice Rutherford for Court Reporter. Court will contact Kathy Glass at kglass@meyersnave.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Nazareth, Matthew)
April 29, 2020 Filing 59 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 20-55445, as to Defendants Chad Bianco, Jeff Hewitt, Kevin Jeffries, George Johnson, Cameron Kaiser, V. Manuel Perez, Karen Spiegel, Chuck Washington for Court Reporter. Court will contact Michelle Quiroz at Mequiroz@rivco.org with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Moran, Kelly)
April 29, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew B Nazareth on behalf of Defendant County of San Bernardino (Attorney Matthew B Nazareth added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:dft))(Nazareth, Matthew)
April 28, 2020 Filing 57 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-55445 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #52 as to Plaintiffs Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales, Brenda Wood. (hr)
April 28, 2020 Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 20-55445, as to plaintiffs Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales, Brenda Wood for Court Reporter. Court will contact Stephen Neilsen at sneilsen@dhillonlaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 28, 2020 Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendants Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom for Court Reporter. Court will contact Todd Grabarsky at todd.grabarsky@doj.ca.gov with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Grabarsky, Todd)
April 28, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Order Form (G-120), #53 . The following error(s) was found: No hearing date for 4/28/2020 on the docket. You must electronically refile the above referenced Request for Transcript in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jlo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 28, 2020 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendants Gavin Newsom for Court Reporter. Court will contact Todd Grabarsky at todd.grabarsky@doj.ca.gov with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Grabarsky, Todd)
April 27, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiffs Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales, Brenda Wood. Appeal of Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #51 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26242092.) (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 23, 2020 Filing 51 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order DENYING Plaintiffs Emergency Request for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. No. #8 ). SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
April 23, 2020 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood. upon Erin Gustafson waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/22/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Deborah J. Fox. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 22, 2020 Filing 49 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge Jesus G. Bernal: RE: Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. No. #8 ). Counsel state their appearances by telephone. The Court hears argument. The matter stands submitted. Court Reporter: Phyllis A. Preston. (twdb)
April 22, 2020 Filing 48 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood, upon Defendant Xavier Becerra served on 4/15/2020, answer due 5/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon G. Arcebide, person authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 22, 2020 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood. upon Gavin Newsom waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Todd Grabarsky. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 22, 2020 Filing 46 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood, upon Defendant Jeff Hewitt served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeff Hewitt, in his official capacity as a Riverside County Supervisor in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 22, 2020 Filing 45 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood, upon Defendant V. Manuel Perez served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hannah Luminauw, Clerk - authorized to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 22, 2020 Filing 44 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood, upon Defendant Chuck Washington served on 4/21/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hannah Lumanauw, Clerk - authorized to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 22, 2020 Filing 43 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood, upon Defendant Kevin Jeffries served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon KEVIN JEFFRIES, in his official capacity as a Riverside County Supervisor in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 22, 2020 Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood, upon Defendant Karen Spiegel served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hannah Lumanauw, Clerk - authorized to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 22, 2020 Filing 41 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood, upon Defendant Chad Bianco served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hannah Lumanauw, Clerk - authorized to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 22, 2020 Filing 40 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood, upon Defendant Josie Gonzales served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ika Arrendondo, Deputy Clerk - authorized to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 21, 2020 Filing 39 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood, upon Defendant Curt Hagman served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ika Arrendondo, Deputy Clerk - authorized to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 21, 2020 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood, upon Defendant Dawn Rowe served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dawn Rowe, in her official capacity as a San Bernardino County Supervisor in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 21, 2020 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood, upon Defendant Janice Rutherford served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ika Arrendondo, Deputy Clerk - authorized to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 21, 2020 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood, upon Defendant Robert Lovinggood served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ika Arrendondo, Deputy Clerk - authorized to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 21, 2020 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood, upon Defendant John McMahon served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sandra Capes, Office Assistant - authorized to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 21, 2020 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood, upon Defendant George Johnson served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hannah Lumanauw, Clerk - authorized to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 21, 2020 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood, upon Defendant Cameron Kaiser served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rhonda Harris, person authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
April 21, 2020 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ronak N Patel counsel for Defendants Chad Bianco, Jeff Hewitt, Kevin Jeffries, George Johnson, Cameron Kaiser, V. Manuel Perez, Karen Spiegel, Chuck Washington. Adding Ronak N. Patel as counsel of record for defendants for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Defendants. (Patel, Ronak)
April 20, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Reply in Support Of Plaintiffs Application For Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales, Brenda Wood. Motion set for hearing on 4/22/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark P. Meuser, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order) (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 20, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Notice prepared in error. Notice of errata filed at Dkt. No #20 . Re: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents #27 . (twdb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Decision: Other Courts Denying TROs filed by defendants Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Grabarsky, Todd)
April 20, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Claim #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Opposition to application (motion related document). Other error(s) with document(s): Should be linked to the Application. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Margaret W Rosequist counsel for Defendants Josie Gonzales, Erin Gustafson, Curt Hagman, Robert Lovinggood, John McMahon, Dawn Rowe, Janice Rutherford. Adding Margaret W. Rosequist as counsel of record for Erin Gustafson, John McMahon, Robert A. Lovingood, Janice Rutherford, Dawn Rowe, Curt Hagman, and Josie Gonzales for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Erin Gustafson, John McMahon, Robert A. Lovingood, Janice Rutherford, Dawn Rowe, Curt Hagman, and Josie Gonzales. (Attorney Margaret W Rosequist added to party Josie Gonzales(pty:dft), Attorney Margaret W Rosequist added to party Erin Gustafson(pty:dft), Attorney Margaret W Rosequist added to party Curt Hagman(pty:dft), Attorney Margaret W Rosequist added to party Robert Lovinggood(pty:dft), Attorney Margaret W Rosequist added to party John McMahon(pty:dft), Attorney Margaret W Rosequist added to party Dawn Rowe(pty:dft), Attorney Margaret W Rosequist added to party Janice Rutherford(pty:dft))(Rosequist, Margaret)
April 19, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Decision: Granted TRO filed by plaintiffs Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales, Brenda Wood. U.S. District Court of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Temorary Restraing Order, #2 Exhibit Memorandum and Order)(Meuser, Mark)
April 17, 2020 Filing 24 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal.The Court hereby sets a Telephone Conference for 4/22/2020 02:00 PM, to address Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. No. 8). The courtroom deputy clerk shall e-mail the attorneys of record the telephone conference number 24 hours before the hearing date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 17, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Deborah J Fox counsel for Defendants Josie Gonzales, Erin Gustafson, Curt Hagman, Robert Lovinggood, John McMahon, Dawn Rowe, Janice Rutherford. Adding Penny Alexander-Kelley as counsel of record for Erin Gustafson; John McMahon; Robert A. Lovingood; Janice Rutherford; Dawn Rowe; Curt Hagman and Josie Gonzales for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Erin Gustafson; John McMahon; Robert A.Lovingood;Janice Rutherford; Dawn Rowe; Curt Hagman and Josie Gonzales. (Attorney Deborah J Fox added to party Josie Gonzales(pty:dft), Attorney Deborah J Fox added to party Curt Hagman(pty:dft), Attorney Deborah J Fox added to party Robert Lovinggood(pty:dft), Attorney Deborah J Fox added to party John McMahon(pty:dft), Attorney Deborah J Fox added to party Dawn Rowe(pty:dft), Attorney Deborah J Fox added to party Janice Rutherford(pty:dft))(Fox, Deborah)
April 17, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Deborah J Fox counsel for Defendant Erin Gustafson. Adding Deborah J. Fox as counsel of record for Erin Gustafson; John McMahon; Robert A. Lovingood; Janice Rutherford; Dawn Rowe; Curt Hagman and Josie Gonzales for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Erin Gustafson; John McMahon; Robert A.Lovingood;Janice Rutherford; Dawn Rowe; Curt Hagman and Josie Gonzales. (Attorney Deborah J Fox added to party Erin Gustafson(pty:dft))(Fox, Deborah)
April 17, 2020 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino, re Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition, #18 served on 4/17/2020. (Fox, Deborah)
April 17, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. correcting Claim #14 Opposition to TRO (Fox, Deborah)
April 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amie L Medley on behalf of Defendants Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom (Attorney Amie L Medley added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Amie L Medley added to party Gavin Newsom(pty:dft))(Medley, Amie)
April 17, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition Re: Emergency REQUEST for Temporary Restraining Order as to All Defendants to Permit Religious Services #8 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A-K)(Fox, Deborah)
April 17, 2020 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Chad Bianco, Jeff Hewitt, Kevin Jeffries, George Johnson, Cameron Kaiser, V. Manuel Perez, Karen Spiegel, Chuck Washington, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),,, #15 served on April 17, 2020. (Moran, Kelly)
April 17, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Chad Bianco, Jeff Hewitt, Kevin Jeffries, George Johnson, Cameron Kaiser, V. Manuel Perez, Karen Spiegel, Chuck Washington, (Moran, Kelly)
April 17, 2020 Filing 15 OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION re: Emergency REQUEST for Temporary Restraining Order as to All Defendants to Permit Religious Services #8 filed by Defendants Chad Bianco, Jeff Hewitt, Kevin Jeffries, George Johnson, Cameron Kaiser, V. Manuel Perez, Karen Spiegel, Chuck Washington. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Jason Anderson, #3 Declaration of Kelly A. Moran, #4 Declaration of Dr. Cameron Kaiser)(Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party Chad Bianco(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party Jeff Hewitt(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party Kevin Jeffries(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party George Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party Cameron Kaiser(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party V. Manuel Perez(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party Karen Spiegel(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party Chuck Washington(pty:dft))(Moran, Kelly)
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 CLAIM filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-K)(Fox, Deborah)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 OPPOSITION to Emergency REQUEST for Temporary Restraining Order as to All Defendants to Permit Religious Services #8 filed by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Todd Grabarsky in Support of Opposition, #2 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Todd Grabarsky added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Grabarsky added to party Gavin Newsom(pty:dft))(Grabarsky, Todd)
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales, Brenda Wood, re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 11 served on 4/15/2020. (Meuser, Mark)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Request for a Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO") [Dkt. No. 8]. Defendants' response to the TRO shall be filed no later than noon, on April 17, 2020. The Court will notify the parties if a hearing is deemed necessary. Plaintiffs shall notify Defendants of this order forthwith. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales, Brenda Wood. correcting Emergency REQUEST for Temporary Restraining Order as to All Defendants to Permit Religious Services #8 Declarations filed without signature (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gish, #2 Declaration of Scales, #3 Declaration of Wood)(Meuser, Mark)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales, Brenda Wood. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 Emergency REQUEST for Temporary Restraining Order as to All Defendants to Permit Religious Services filed by Plaintiffs Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales, Brenda Wood. Request set for hearing on 6/1/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Mark Meuser, #3 Declaration of Wendy Gish, #4 Declaration of James Moffatt, #5 Declaration of Patrick Scales, #6 Declaration of Brenda Wood) (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately and in the correct event. The correct event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. (car)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendants Xavier Becerra, Chad Bianco, Josie Gonzalez, Erin Gustafson, Curt Hagman, Jeff Hewitt, Kevin Jeffries, George Johnson, Cameron Kaiser, Robert Lovinggood, John McMahon, Gavin Newsom, V. Manuel Perez, Dawn Rowe, Janice Rutherford, Karen Spiegel, Chuck Washington. (car)
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 13, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales, Brenda Wood. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26064962 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Wendy Gish(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party James Dean Moffatt(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Patrick Scales(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Brenda Wood(pty:pla))(Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26064962 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Patrick Scales, Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Brenda Wood. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Wendy Gish(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party James Dean Moffatt(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Patrick Scales(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Brenda Wood(pty:pla))(Dhillon, Harmeet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wendy Gish et al v. Gavin Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Todd Grabarsky
Represented By: Amie L Medley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McMahon
Represented By: Penelope Alexander-Kelley
Represented By: Deborah J Fox
Represented By: Michelle Danielle Blakemore
Represented By: Margaret W Rosequist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Washington
Represented By: Kelly Anne Moran
Represented By: Ronak N Patel
Represented By: James E Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Spiegel
Represented By: Kelly Anne Moran
Represented By: Ronak N Patel
Represented By: James E Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Bianco
Represented By: Kelly Anne Moran
Represented By: Ronak N Patel
Represented By: James E Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curt Hagman
Represented By: Penelope Alexander-Kelley
Represented By: Deborah J Fox
Represented By: Michelle Danielle Blakemore
Represented By: Margaret W Rosequist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Rutherford
Represented By: Penelope Alexander-Kelley
Represented By: Deborah J Fox
Represented By: Michelle Danielle Blakemore
Represented By: Margaret W Rosequist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josie Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Kaiser
Represented By: Kelly Anne Moran
Represented By: Ronak N Patel
Represented By: James E Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Johnson
Represented By: Kelly Anne Moran
Represented By: Ronak N Patel
Represented By: James E Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Hewitt
Represented By: Kelly Anne Moran
Represented By: Ronak N Patel
Represented By: James E Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lovinggood
Represented By: Penelope Alexander-Kelley
Represented By: Deborah J Fox
Represented By: Michelle Danielle Blakemore
Represented By: Margaret W Rosequist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Rowe
Represented By: Penelope Alexander-Kelley
Represented By: Deborah J Fox
Represented By: Michelle Danielle Blakemore
Represented By: Margaret W Rosequist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Gustafson
Represented By: Penelope Alexander-Kelley
Represented By: Michelle Danielle Blakemore
Represented By: Deborah J Fox
Represented By: Margaret W Rosequist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Christopher Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Jeffries
Represented By: Kelly Anne Moran
Represented By: Ronak N Patel
Represented By: James E Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Manuel Perez
Represented By: Kelly Anne Moran
Represented By: Ronak N Patel
Represented By: James E Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Represented By: Todd Grabarsky
Represented By: Amie L Medley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Bernardino
Represented By: Michelle Danielle Blakemore
Represented By: Deborah J Fox
Represented By: Margaret W Rosequist
Represented By: Matthew B Nazareth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josie Gonzales
Represented By: Penelope Alexander-Kelley
Represented By: Deborah J Fox
Represented By: Michelle Danielle Blakemore
Represented By: Margaret W Rosequist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Scales
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Gish
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Wood
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dean Moffatt
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?