Lake Hemet Municipal Water District v. The Dow Chemical Company et al
Plaintiff: Lake Hemet Municipal Water District
Defendant: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc, The Dow Chemical Company, 1-10 DOES, Shell Oil Company, DOES 1 through 300, Inclusive, Crop Production Services, Inc. and Shell Oil Company doing business as Shell Chemical Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00881
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of address by Seth D Mansergh attorney for Plaintiff Lake Hemet Municipal Water District. Changing attorneys address to SL Environmental Law Group, PC, 175 Chestnut Street, San Francisco, CA 94133. Filed by Plaintiff Lake Hemet Municipal Water District. (Mansergh, Seth)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 07/13/2020 11:00 AM. (pg)
May 26, 2020 Filing 19 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company, identifying Dow Inc.. (Langner, Bailey)
May 26, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company.(Attorney Bailey J Langner added to party The Dow Chemical Company(pty:dft))(Langner, Bailey)
May 26, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company, identifying Lake Hemet Municipal Water District (Plaintiff); The Dow Chemical Company (Defendant); Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., formerly known as Crop Production Services, Inc. (Defendant). (Smith, Jay)
May 26, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc, identifying Lake Hemet Municipal Water District (Plaintiff); The Dow Chemical Company (Defendant); Shell Oil Company, formerly doing business as Shell Chemical Company (Defendant). (Smith, Jay)
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc identifying Nutrien Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Jay)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company identifying Royal Dutch Shell plc as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Jay)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.(Attorney Jay E Smith added to party Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc(pty:dft))(Smith, Jay)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company.(Attorney Jay E Smith added to party Shell Oil Company(pty:dft))(Smith, Jay)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-02022 MWF(SPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-00881 MWF(SPx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc, Shell Oil Company and The Dow Chemical Company. (jtil)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Lake Hemet Municipal Water District. Related Case(s): JCCP 4435 (Mansergh, Seth)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Lake Hemet Municipal Water District. Related Case(s): 5:18-cv-02022-MWF-SPx; 2:18-cv-10139-MWF-SPx; 5:19-cv-00842-MWF-SPx (Mansergh, Seth)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lake Hemet Municipal Water District, (Mansergh, Seth)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lake Hemet Municipal Water District. (Mansergh, Seth)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lake Hemet Municipal Water District. (Mansergh, Seth)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26217467 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lake Hemet Municipal Water District. (Attorney Seth D Mansergh added to party Lake Hemet Municipal Water District(pty:pla))(Mansergh, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lake Hemet Municipal Water District v. The Dow Chemical Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Jay E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Bailey J Langner
Represented By: Nicholas D Kayhan
Represented By: Alessandra M Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-10 DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Megan Ritsu Nishikawa
Represented By: Jay E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 300, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crop Production Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jay E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company doing business as Shell Chemical Company
Represented By: Megan Ritsu Nishikawa
Represented By: Jay E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Hemet Municipal Water District
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?