Alonso Castaneda Andrade v. Chad F. Wolf et al
Petitioner: Alonso Castaneda Andrade
Respondent: Acting Secretary Chad F. Wolf, Acting Matthew T. Albence, David Marin and Warden James Janecka
Case Number: 5:2020cv00943
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Electronic Filing re Scheduling Order,,,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,, #8 e-mailed to Bernal Ojeda bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: The Court has considered the evidence and arguments presented in favor of and against Petitioners' petition for a writ of habeas corpus. While the petition sets forth significant legal issues, there are significant disparities in the facts as set forth by the parties. The Court will combine the evidentiary hearing on Petitioners' petition for a writ of habeas corpus with a court trial on Petitioners' claims for injunctive and declaratory relief. The following dates are subject to change by the Court in response to the COVID-19 pandemic; at this time, it is unclear as to when the First Street Courthouse will re-open for evidentiary hearings and court trials for civil cases. July 31, 2020: Discovery Cut Off; August 10, 2020: Substantive Motion Filing Deadline; August 27, 2020: Motion in Limine Filing Deadline; September 14, 2020: Final Pretrial Conference; October 6, 2020: Evidentiary hearing and court trial at 10:00 a.m. While the Ninth Circuit has not yet reached the issue, it is clear to the Court that it has the inherent authority, at least in extraordinary cases, to release detainees on bail during the pendency of their habeas petitions. Consequently, the Court will entertain a class-wide motion for bail. If such a motion is filed and granted, the Court will, thereafter, individually consider whether each class member is eligible for bail, with or without conditions of release. The Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this order in each of the related, individually filed Adelanto habeas cases to give notice of the Court's willingness to entertain motions to intervene for the limited purpose of seeking bail. A list of those cases is attached to this order. (bm)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STAY ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr.: Petitioner is a member of the provisionally certified class in Roman. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that pending a final resolution of Roman, this case be, and hereby is, STAYED. (shb)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. See order for further details. (shb)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (ghap)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Petitioner/Plaiintiff Alonso Castaneda Andrade. Related Case(s): 5:20-cv-605 (Ojeda, Bernal)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner/Plaintiff Alonso Castaneda Andrade, (Ojeda, Bernal)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Alonso Castaneda Andrade. (Ojeda, Bernal)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody (28 USC 2241), Receipt No. ACACDC-26292792 for $5 filing fee, filed by Petitioner/Plaiintiff Alonso Castaneda Andrade. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration) (Attorney Bernal Peter Ojeda added to party Alonso Castaneda Andrade(pty:pet))(Ojeda, Bernal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alonso Castaneda Andrade v. Chad F. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Secretary Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Matthew T. Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden James Janecka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alonso Castaneda Andrade
Represented By: Bernal Peter Ojeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?