Alexis Nicholas Gonzalez v. Chad F. Wolf, et al
Petitioner: Alexis Nicholas Gonzalez
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf, Matthew T Albence, David Marin and James Janecka
Case Number: 5:2020cv00958
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: The Court has considered Petitioner's Motion to Lift Stay, #9 , together with moving and opposing papers, #13 . IT IS ORDERED that the motion be, and hereby ism, DENIED. (shb)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. The Court has considered the evidence and arguments presented in favor of and against Petitioners petition for a writ of habeas corpus. The Court will combine the evidentiary hearing on Petitioners petition for a writ of habeas corpus with a court trial on Petitioners claims for injunctive and declaratory relief. Each side will be allowed 8 hours to present their case. The time limit includes all aspects of the case, including opening statements, direct and cross examinations, arguments on objections, and closing arguments. In lieu of closing arguments, the parties may file closing briefs, of no more than 25 pages, no later than ten days after the conclusion of the evidentiary hearing and trial. The following dates are subject to change by the Court in response to the COVID-19 pandemic; at this time, it is unclear as to when the First Street Courthouse will re-open for evidentiary hearings and court trials for civil cases. Discovery cut-off 7/31/2020., Substantive Motion Filing Deadline by 8/10/2020., Motions in Limine Filing Deadline filed by 8/27/2020., Evidentiary Hearing and Court Trial set for 10/6/2020 at 10:00 a.m., Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 10:00 a.m. While the Ninth Circuit has not yet reached the issue, it is clear to the Court that it has the inherent authority, at least in extraordinary cases, to release detainees on bail during the pendency of their habeas petitions. See order for further details. DOCKETED IN THIS CASE PER PAGE ATTACHMENT. (iv)
May 20, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY Reply REQUEST to Lift Stay re REQUEST FOR LIFT OF PARTIAL STAY #9 filed by Petitioner Alexis Nicholas Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Diaz, Katrina)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST to Lift Stay re REQUEST FOR LIFT OF PARTIAL STAY #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
May 15, 2020 Filing 11 OPPOSITION TO REQUEST TO LIFT STAY in Opposition to re: REQUEST to Lift Stay re REQUEST FOR LIFT OF PARTIAL STAY #9 filed by Respondents Matthew T Albence, James Janecka, David Marin, Chad F. Wolf. (Pinchas, David)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David E Pinchas counsel for Respondents Matthew T Albence, James Janecka, David Marin, Chad F. Wolf. Adding David Pinchas as counsel of record for Chad F. Wolf, Matthew T. Albence, David Marin, and James Janecka, all in their official capacities for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by respondents Chad F. Wolf, Matthew T. Albence, David Marin, and James Janecka. (Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Matthew T Albence(pty:res), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party James Janecka(pty:res), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party David Marin(pty:res), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Chad F. Wolf(pty:res))(Pinchas, David)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST to Lift Stay re REQUEST FOR LIFT OF PARTIAL STAY filed by Plaintiff Alexis Nicholas Gonzalez. (Diaz, Katrina)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Alexis Nicholas Gonzalez, re APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoining respondents from continuing to detain petitioner #2 , Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #1 served on 05-05-2020. (Diaz, Katrina)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STAY ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Petitioner is a member of the provisionally certified class in Roman. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that pending a final resolution of Roman, this case be, and hereby is, STAYED. (shb)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS NEW CZSE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. See order for further details. (shb)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF STAY filed by respondents Matthew T Albence, James Janecka, David Marin, Chad F. Wolf. (Pinchas, David)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Alexis Nicholas Gonzalez, re APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoining respondents from continuing to detain petitioner #2 , Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #1 served on 05-01-2020. (Diaz, Katrina)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (esa)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoining respondents from continuing to detain petitioner filed by Plaintiff-Petitioner ALEXIS NICHOLAS GONZALEZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec of Alexis N. Gonazalez, #2 Declaration Dec of Katrina Diaz Wu, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Granting Restraining Order, #8 Order to Show Cause) (Diaz, Katrina)
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody (28 USC 2241), Receipt No. ACACDC-26307975 for $5 filing fee, filed by Plaintiff-Petitioner ALEXIS NICHOLAS GONZALEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet) (Attorney Katrina Diaz added to party ALEXIS NICHOLAS GONZALEZ(pty:pla))(Diaz, Katrina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexis Nicholas Gonzalez v. Chad F. Wolf, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T Albence
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Marin
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Janecka
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alexis Nicholas Gonzalez
Represented By: Debra Garfinkle
Represented By: Bernadette M Duran
Represented By: Katrina Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?