Maher Roman v. The United States Department of Veteran Affairs
Plaintiff: Maher Roman
Defendant: The United States Department of Veteran Affairs
Case Number: 5:2020cv01014
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maher Roman, upon Defendant The United States Department of Veteran Affairs served on 5/15/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Swanson, Sara)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 19-03 (identical case) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Case number now reads as 5:20-cv-01014-AB-SHKx. (aco)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant The United States Department of Veteran Affairs. (twdb)
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #6 filed by Plaintiff Maher Roman. (Swanson, Sara)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maher Roman, identifying Maher Roman. (Swanson, Sara)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maher Roman, identifying Maher Roman. (Swanson, Sara)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST-FILED as COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (400.00 paid on 05/12/2020, receipt number 26415507), filed by plaintiff Maher Roman, MD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Swanson, Sara) Modified on 5/12/2020 (ghap).
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26415507 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Maher Roman, MD. (Attorney Sara A Swanson added to party Maher Roman, MD(pty:pla))(Swanson, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maher Roman v. The United States Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maher Roman
Represented By: Sara A Swanson
Represented By: Sarah K O'Brien
Represented By: Robert Garcia, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey C McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?