Norma Devi et al v. Sanjiv Goel et al
Plaintiff: Norma Devi and ADALCA, LLC
Defendant: Sanjiv Goel, Does 1-10 and Amazing Healing, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv01037
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Answer #16 , for the following reasons: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (bm)
July 8, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
July 2, 2020 Filing 17 COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Sanjiv Goel.(Boydston, Brian)
July 2, 2020 Filing 16 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 7/10/20. ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Amazing Healing, LLC and filed by Defendant Sanjiv Goel.(Attorney Brian D Boydston added to party Sanjiv Goel(pty:dft))(Boydston, Brian) Modified on 7/10/2020 (bm).
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Amazing Healing, LLC. (bm)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Amended Miscellaneous Initiating Documents #7 , for the following reasons: Other: Party indicated in the "To:" (Amazing Healing, LLC), section is cutoff. Case number and judge's initials are not indicate in the caption of the request The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and refile your summons request. (bm)
May 21, 2020 Filing 13 Amazing Summons filed by Plaintiffs ADALCA, LLC, Norma Devi re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Duran, Jack)
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #7 . The following error(s) was found: Party indicated in the "To:" (Amazing Healing, LLC), section is cut-off. Case number and judge's initials are not indicate in the caption of the request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (bm)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Sanjiv Goel. (bm)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Goel filed by Plaintiffs ADALCA, LLC, Norma Devi (Duran, Jack)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #7 . The following error(s) was found: Docket entry text does not match caption of attached document. Party indicated in the "To:" (Sanjiv Goel), section is cut-off. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (bm)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 5/21/20. AMENDED MISC - Other Miscellaneous Case against Defendant All Defendants. Re MISC - Other Miscellaneous Case #6 , filed by Plaintiff Norma Devi (Attachments: #1 Summons Corrected)(Duran, Jack) Modified on 5/21/2020 (bm).
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Interested Parties with filing fee previously paid (400.00 paid on 5/15/20, receipt number ACACDC-26455278), filed by Plaintiff Norma Devi.(Duran, Jack)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. File each summons request separately under the "Summons Request" event. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): The Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. It should have been filed separately under its correct event/relief. You need not respond regarding this item unless the Court directs you to do so. (esa)
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (esa)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26455278 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Norma Devi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Amazing, #3 Summons Goel) (Attorney Jack Duran, Jr added to party Norma Devi(pty:pla))(Duran, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norma Devi et al v. Sanjiv Goel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanjiv Goel
Represented By: Brian D Boydston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazing Healing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Devi
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADALCA, LLC
Represented By: Jack Duran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?