Mark Smith et al v. Sergei Daniel Vinkov et al
Plaintiff: Solar Forward Electric, Inc. and Mark Smith
Defendant: Sergei Daniel Vinkov, Does 1 through 25, inclusive and Sergei Vinkov
Case Number: 5:2020cv01070
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 26 Receipt of remand letter from Riverside County Superior Court (twdb)
July 7, 2020 Filing 25 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Riverside County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Riverside County Superior Court. (iv)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND #16 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Plaintiffs' motion to remand is GRANTED. This action is hereby remanded to Riverside County Superior Court. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv)
July 1, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #16 filed by Plaintiff Mark Smith. (Lewis, Bret)
June 29, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Sergei Vinkov, re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #21 the CM/ECF system served on 06/29/2020. (Vinkov, Sergei)
June 29, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #16 filed by Defendant Sergei Vinkov. (Attachments: #1 Declaration SERGEI VINKOV'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND)(Vinkov, Sergei)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #17 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The request of Mark Smith, Solar Forward Electric, Inc. to substitute Bret Lewis as attorney of record instead of Paul Levine is GRANTED. (iv)
June 23, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Attorney. Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Errata filed by Plaintiff Mark Smith. as to Proof of Service on Doc. 16 Motion (Lewis, Bret)
June 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bret D Lewis on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark Smith, Solar Forward Electric, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Bret D Lewis added to party Solar Forward Electric, Inc.(pty:pla))(Lewis, Bret)
June 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Mark Smith. Motion set for hearing on 7/20/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Bret D. Lewis, #2 Declaration Declaration of Mark Smith, #3 Declaration Declaration of Paul Levine, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney Bret D Lewis added to party Mark Smith(pty:pla)) (Lewis, Bret)
June 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Chief Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on August 6, 2020. (gga)
June 8, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Sergei Vinkov, re Answer to Complaint, #13 served on 06/05/2020. (Vinkov, Sergei)
June 8, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Notice of Removal, #3 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Sergei Vinkov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit)(Vinkov, Sergei)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #7 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (lom)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:19-cv-01821-CJC-SPx. Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-CV-01070-CJC-SPx. Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (aco)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE by Mail filed by Defendant Sergei Daniel Vinkov, re APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case #7 served on 5/26/2020. (lh)
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case, filed by Defendant Sergei Daniel Vinkov. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (lh)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Sergei Daniel Vinkov, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice of Removal, #3 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 served on 5/20/2020. (lh)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pendency of other Actions or Proceedings, filed by Defendant Sergei Daniel Vinkov. Related Case(s): 5:19-cv-01821-CJC (SPx) (lh)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sergei Daniel Vinkov, (lh)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Riverside, case number MCC1900188 with NON-CONFORMED copy of summons and first amended complaint. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Filing fee $400 PAID, filed by Defendant Sergei Daniel Vinkov. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF LODGING Sergei Vinkov's Notice Of Removal filed by Defendant Sergei Daniel Vinkov (Attachments: #1 Application For Permission For Electronic Filing, #2 Proposed Order Re Application For Permission For Electronic Filing, #3 Proof Of Service By Mail Re Application For Permission For Electronic Filing, [Proposed] Order Re Application For Permission For Electronic Filing, #4 Certificate Of Interested Parties, #5 CV-71 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Notice of Pendency Of Other Actions Or Proceedings, #7 Proof of Service Re Notice of Pendency-Notice of Removal-Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)-Certificate Of Interested Parties-Proof Of Service)(bm)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH LODGING OF COMPLAINT mailed to Defendant Sergei Daniel Vinkov. Upon submission of your complaint, the following discrepancy was found: You have not submitted the entire filing fee amount of $400. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you may request that the fee be waived. To do so, you must complete, sign, and return the enclose form, Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60), in its entirety. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your your action will be dismissed. If your fee waiver request or payment is received within THIRTY DAYS, judges will be assigned to your case. You may return your fee waiver request or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. Re Lodged Complaint (Attachments: #1 CV-60) (lh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2020: #2 Lodged Notice of Removal) (lh).
May 21, 2020 LODGED NOTICE OF REMOVAL sought to be filed by Defendant Sergei Daniel Vinkov. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mark Smith et al v. Sergei Daniel Vinkov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solar Forward Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Bret D Lewis
Represented By: Paul Aaron Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Smith
Represented By: Bret D Lewis
Represented By: Paul Aaron Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergei Daniel Vinkov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergei Vinkov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?