Ecological Rights Foundation et al v. Hot Line Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Santa Barbara Channelkeeper and Ecological Rights Foundation
Defendant: Hot Line Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01108
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 12 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #10 as to Defendant Southern California Edison Company. (gk)
June 9, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #10 filed by plaintiff Ecological Rights Foundation, Santa Barbara Channelkeeper. (Flanders, Jason)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Ecological Rights Foundation, Santa Barbara Channelkeeper (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table 1)(Sproul, Christopher)
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Hot Line Construction, Inc. (gk)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Ecological Rights Foundation, Santa Barbara Channelkeeper. (Orion, Brian)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Ecological Rights Foundation, Santa Barbara Channelkeeper, (Sproul, Christopher)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants Ecological Rights Foundation, Santa Barbara Channelkeeper. (Sproul, Christopher)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26618152 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Ecological Rights Foundation, Santa Barbara Channelkeeper. (Attorney Christopher A Sproul added to party Ecological Rights Foundation(pty:bkmov), Attorney Christopher A Sproul added to party Santa Barbara Channelkeeper(pty:bkmov))(Sproul, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ecological Rights Foundation et al v. Hot Line Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot Line Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Barbara Channelkeeper
Represented By: Brian Orion
Represented By: Christopher A Sproul
Represented By: Jason Robert Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ecological Rights Foundation
Represented By: Brian Orion
Represented By: Christopher A Sproul
Represented By: Jason Robert Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?