Juan David Torres Vasquez v. Chad Wolf et al
Petitioner: Juan David Torres Vasquez
Respondent: William Barr, Chad Wolf, David A. Marin and Gabriel Valdez
Case Number: 5:2020cv01367
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Counsel are hereby notified that pursuant to the Judge's directive, this case is dismissed as moot. The petitioner was deported on July 27, 2020, this case is now moot. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Respondents William Barr, David A. Marin, Gabriel Valdez, Chad Wolfto Order to Show Cause #11 , Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #1 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Jenson, #2 Exhibit One to Jenson Declaration, #3 Declaration of Joanne Osinoff)(Osinoff, Joanne)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned addressed to Juan David Torres Vasquez re Striking filed Documents (CV-80) #9 . Released/Damaged/Refused. (hr)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Respondents' Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/26/2020. (dts)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned addressed to Juan David Torres Vasquez re Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #7 . Attempted - not known. (hr)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: the documents listed below were improperly filed for the following reasons: The Court granted Petitioner's IFP application, dkt. 6, on July 14, 2020, see dkt. 7.; therefore, the following document(s) shall be stricken from the record and shall not be considered by the Court: REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #8 . (dts)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by petitioner Juan David Torres Vasquez. (iva)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: granting #6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (iva)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (iva)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PARTIAL STAY ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Petitioner is a member of the provisionally certified class in Roman. It is Ordered that pending a final resolution of Roman, Petitioners Fifth Amendment substantive due process claim in this case be, and hereby is, Stayed. (shb)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by petitioner Juan David Torres Vasquez. (iva) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/21/2020) (iva).
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. See order for further details. (shb)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV 111) (esa)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato,(Filing fee $ 5 due), filed by petitioner Juan David Torres Vasquez. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juan David Torres Vasquez v. Chad Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David A. Marin
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gabriel Valdez
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan David Torres Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?