Antonio Cerna Flores v. Gabriel Valdez et al
Petitioner: Antonio Cerna Flores
Respondent: David Marin, Chad Wolf, Matthew T Albetnce, Henry Lucero, Alysa D. Erichs and Gabriel Valdez
Case Number: 5:2020cv01394
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: On August 28, 2020, Respondent filed a Motion to Dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ("Motion to Dismiss"). Petitioner shall file a Response/Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss within thirty (30) days (i.e., by not later than October 9, 2020). Respondent shall file a Reply within fourteen (14) days of the formal filing date of Petitioner's Response/Opposition. (es)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by respondents Matthew T Albetnce, Alysa D. Erichs, Henry Lucero, David Marin, Gabriel Valdez, Chad Wolf, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 served on 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Green, Paul)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Respondents Matthew T Albetnce, Alysa D. Erichs, Henry Lucero, David Marin, Gabriel Valdez, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration from ICE, #2 Exhibit 1 (Bond reconsideration order), #3 Exhibit 2 (Order on Motion to Reconsider), #4 Proposed Order) (Green, Paul)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Respondents Matthew T Albetnce, Alysa D. Erichs, Henry Lucero, David Marin, Gabriel Valdez, Chad Wolf, re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #7 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 8/28/2020 re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #1 #6 served on August 7, 2020. (Green, Paul)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER EXTENDING RESPONDENTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO PETITION #6 by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondents will have up to, and including, August 28, 2020 to file a response to the Petition. (es)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 8/28/2020 re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #1 filed by respondents Matthew T Albetnce, Alysa D. Erichs, Henry Lucero, David Marin, Gabriel Valdez, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Respondents' Time to Respond to Petition) (Green, Paul)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul Bartholomew Green counsel for Respondents Matthew T Albetnce, Alysa D. Erichs, Henry Lucero, David Marin, Gabriel Valdez, Chad Wolf. Adding Paul B. Green as counsel of record for Gabriel Valdez, David Marin, Matthew T. Albence, Alysa D. Erichs, Chad Wolf, and Henry Lucero for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Gabriel Valdez, David Marin, Matthew T. Albence, Alysa D. Erichs, Chad Wolf, and Henry Lucero. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Paul Bartholomew Green added to party Matthew T Albetnce(pty:res), Attorney Paul Bartholomew Green added to party Alysa D. Erichs(pty:res), Attorney Paul Bartholomew Green added to party Henry Lucero(pty:res), Attorney Paul Bartholomew Green added to party David Marin(pty:res), Attorney Paul Bartholomew Green added to party Gabriel Valdez(pty:res), Attorney Paul Bartholomew Green added to party Chad Wolf(pty:res))(Green, Paul)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 from Antonio Cerna Flores. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #1 . Receipt number LA209106. (fr)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Respondents shall file an Answer to the Petition within twenty-three (23) days of the date of this Order. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (es)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111 and CV-27) (ghap)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian.(Filing fee $ 5: FEE DUE), filed by petitioner Antonio Cerna Flores. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Cerna Flores v. Gabriel Valdez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Marin
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Paul Bartholomew Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Paul Bartholomew Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T Albetnce
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Paul Bartholomew Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Henry Lucero
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Paul Bartholomew Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alysa D. Erichs
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Paul Bartholomew Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gabriel Valdez
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Paul Bartholomew Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio Cerna Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?