Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club v. Whirlpool Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club
Defendant: DOES 1 to 25, Inclusive and Whirlpool Corporation
Case Number: 5:2020cv01416
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club filed by Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club identifying Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club as Corporate Parent. (Terhufen, Kellie)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club.. (Terhufen, Kellie)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph M Wahl counsel for Defendant Whirlpool Corporation. Bejan Eyre Atashkar is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Whirlpool Corporation. (Wahl, Joseph)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car)
July 17, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Whirlpool Corporation. Filed in State Court on 7/15/2020 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #3 (Attorney Bejan Eyre Atashkar added to party Whirlpool Corporation(pty:dft))(car)
July 17, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 25, Inclusive, Whirlpool Corporation, filed by Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club. Filed in State Court on 6/12/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #3 (car)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number MCC2000886 with filing fee previously paid (400.00 paid on 07/17/2020, receipt number Tracking ID ACACDC-27258783), filed by Defendant Whirlpool Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of All Process, Pleadings, and Orders Served Upon Whirlpool, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Itemized Damages Demand)(Wahl, Joseph)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Whirlpool Corporation, identifying Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club; Whirlpool Corporation; Barbara Prince; Vanguard Group, Inc.; PRIMECAP Management Company; Whirlpool S.A.; Whirlpool of India, Limited; and Whirlpool China Co., Ltd.. (Attorney Joseph M Wahl added to party Whirlpool Corporation(pty:dft))(Wahl, Joseph)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Whirlpool Corporation. (Wahl, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club v. Whirlpool Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club
Represented By: Kellie L Terhufen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 25, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Joseph M Wahl
Represented By: Bejan Eyre Atashkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?