James Rutherford v. Wienerschnitzel et al
Plaintiff: James Rutherford
Defendant: CORRIDOR LAND COMPANY, a California corporation, TECOLOTE RESOURCES, INC., a California corporation, WIENERSCHNITZEL, a business of unknown form, DOES 1-10 Inclusive, Tecolote Resources, Inc., Corridor Land Company and Wienerschnitzel
Case Number: 5:2020cv01551
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-137) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., this case is transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to the calendar of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-01551-SB. (ap)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Rutherford, upon Defendant Wienerschnitzel served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hashemi, Babak)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Rutherford, upon Defendant Tecolote Resources, Inc. served on 9/3/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hashemi, Babak)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Rutherford, upon Defendant Corridor Land Company served on 9/3/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hashemi, Babak)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Tecolote Resources, Inc. answer now due 10/8/2020; Corridor Land Company answer now due 10/8/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Tecolote Resources, Inc.; Corridor Land Company.(Attorney Jeffrey David Montez added to party Corridor Land Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey David Montez added to party Tecolote Resources, Inc.(pty:dft))(Montez, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Corridor Land Company, Tecolote Resources, Inc. and Wienerschnitzel. (Attachments: #1 Tecolote, #2 Wienerschnitzel) (jtil)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff James Rutherford. (Hashemi, Babak)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff James Rutherford. (Hashemi, Babak)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff James Rutherford. (Hashemi, Babak)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff James Rutherford, (Hashemi, Babak)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff James Rutherford. (Hashemi, Babak)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27482279 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff James Rutherford. (Attorney Babak Hashemi added to party James Rutherford(pty:pla))(Hashemi, Babak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Rutherford v. Wienerschnitzel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRIDOR LAND COMPANY, a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TECOLOTE RESOURCES, INC., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIENERSCHNITZEL, a business of unknown form
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tecolote Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie A Bower
Represented By: Jeffrey David Montez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corridor Land Company
Represented By: Leslie A Bower
Represented By: Jeffrey David Montez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wienerschnitzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rutherford
Represented By: Babak Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?