Richard Hart et al v. Stephanie Clendenin et al
Plaintiff: Richard Hart, Aldo Hernandez, Graham Waldrop, Ervin Longstreet and Charles Gluck
Defendant: Stephanie Clendenin and Janine Wallace
Case Number: 5:2020cv01559
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendants Stephanie Clendenin, Janine Wallace. upon Janine Wallace waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Lisa Tillman. (Tillman, Lisa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendants Stephanie Clendenin, Janine Wallace. upon Stephanie Clendenin waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Lisa Tillman. (Tillman, Lisa)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-02604 JGB (SHKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-01559 JGB (SHKx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani (esa)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Stephanie Clendenin. (ghap)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Janine Wallace. (ghap)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Charles Gluck, Richard Hart, Aldo Hernandez, Ervin Longstreet, Graham Waldrop. Related Case(s): 19-cv-01546-JGB (SHKx); 08:20-cv-00835-JGB (SHKx); 2:20-cv-4450-CBM (PVC); 5:20-cv-00768-JTH (PVC); 20-cv-00605-TJH (AFMx); 2:20-cv-03172-ODW (MRWx) (Choe, Samantha)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Charles Gluck, Richard Hart, Aldo Hernandez, Ervin Longstreet, Graham Waldrop. (Choe, Samantha)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Charles Gluck, Richard Hart, Aldo Hernandez, Ervin Longstreet, Graham Waldrop. (Choe, Samantha)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Choe, Samantha)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Charles Gluck, Richard Hart, Aldo Hernandez, Ervin Longstreet, Graham Waldrop. (Choe, Samantha)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27510027 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Richard Hart, Charles Gluck, Aldo Hernandez, Ervin Longstreet, Graham Waldrop. (Attorney Samantha J Choe added to party Charles Gluck(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha J Choe added to party Richard Hart(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha J Choe added to party Aldo Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha J Choe added to party Ervin Longstreet(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha J Choe added to party Graham Waldrop(pty:pla))(Choe, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Hart et al v. Stephanie Clendenin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hart
Represented By: Samantha J Choe
Represented By: Sylvia Huang
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Sarah Joy Gregory
Represented By: Jennifer L Stark
Represented By: Kimberly Nicole Pederson
Represented By: Anne Hadreas
Represented By: Annie Yue Shi
Represented By: Addison Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldo Hernandez
Represented By: Samantha J Choe
Represented By: Sylvia Huang
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Sarah Joy Gregory
Represented By: Jennifer L Stark
Represented By: Kimberly Nicole Pederson
Represented By: Anne Hadreas
Represented By: Annie Yue Shi
Represented By: Addison Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graham Waldrop
Represented By: Samantha J Choe
Represented By: Sylvia Huang
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Sarah Joy Gregory
Represented By: Jennifer L Stark
Represented By: Kimberly Nicole Pederson
Represented By: Anne Hadreas
Represented By: Annie Yue Shi
Represented By: Addison Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin Longstreet
Represented By: Samantha J Choe
Represented By: Sylvia Huang
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Sarah Joy Gregory
Represented By: Jennifer L Stark
Represented By: Kimberly Nicole Pederson
Represented By: Anne Hadreas
Represented By: Annie Yue Shi
Represented By: Addison Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Gluck
Represented By: Samantha J Choe
Represented By: Sylvia Huang
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Sarah Joy Gregory
Represented By: Jennifer L Stark
Represented By: Kimberly Nicole Pederson
Represented By: Anne Hadreas
Represented By: Annie Yue Shi
Represented By: Addison Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Clendenin
Represented By: Lisa Anne Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janine Wallace
Represented By: Lisa Anne Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?