Jesse Mendivil Sr. v. United States of America
Petitioner: Jesse Mendivil, Sr
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2020cv01577
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 OPPOSITION filed by Respondent United States of America. (Evans, Abigail)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONTINUING BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. Section 2255 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips granting #5 EX PARTE APPLICATION: THEREFORE, FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN: The deadline for the government to file its opposition to Defendant's Motion Under 28 U.S.C. Section 2255 is continued to September 22, 2020. Petitioner's Reply, if any, is due no later than October 13, 2020. (bm)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for ORDER CONTINUING BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Evans, Abigail)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Abigail W Evans counsel for Respondent United States of America. Adding Abigail W. Evans as counsel of record for USA for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff USA. (Attorney Abigail W Evans added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Evans, Abigail)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING RETURN OF Section 2255 MOTION by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) #1 : Based upon Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed herein and good cause appearing: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States Attorney file a Return to the motion on or before 9/1/2020, accompanied by all records, and that Respondent serve a copy of the Return upon the Petitioner prior to the filing thereof.NO EXTENSIONS OF TIME WILL BE GRANTED EXCEPT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN UNDER EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the Petitioner desires to file a Reply to the Return, he shall do so twenty-one days from the Return filing date, setting forth separately: (a) his admission or denial of any new factual allegations of the Return, and (b) any additional legal arguments. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if any pleading or other paper submitted to be filed and considered by the Court does not include a certificate of service upon the Respondent, or counsel for Respondent, it will be stricken from this case and disregarded by the Court. (bm)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (et)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips. For docketing entries refer to CR Case # 5:14-cr-0107-VAP-3, filed by Petitioner Jesse Mendivil, Sr. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jesse Mendivil Sr. v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR
Represented By: Abigail W Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesse Mendivil, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?