Bryan Estrada v. The Pines Apartments et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Estrada
Defendant: The Pines Apartments, Does 1-10, inclusive, Todd Haig and Amy N Haig
Case Number: 5:2020cv01588
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
2 Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-137) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., this case is transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to the calendar of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-01588-SB. (ap)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Estrada, upon Defendant Todd Haig served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Todd R. Haig by Amy N. Haig in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Estrada, upon Defendant The Pines Apartments served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Pines Apartments in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Estrada, upon Defendant Amy N Haig served on 8/13/2020, answer due 9/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy N. Haig in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Amy N Haig, Todd Haig, The Pines Apartments. (ghap)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Bryan Estrada. (Cornell, Ross)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bryan Estrada, (Cornell, Ross)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bryan Estrada. (Cornell, Ross)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27559938 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Bryan Estrada. (Attorney Ross Cornell added to party Bryan Estrada(pty:pla))(Cornell, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan Estrada v. The Pines Apartments et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Estrada
Represented By: Ross Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pines Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Haig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy N Haig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?