Darla Drinan v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Darla Drinan
Defendant: Joshua Birsch, Douglas Christner, United Sates of America, Does 1-10, Joshua Bisch and United States of America
Case Number: 5:2020cv01634
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Darla Drinan, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to R. Luneer. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Ely Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to R. Luneer. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Cohan, Gabriel)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Darla Drinan, upon Defendant Douglas Christner served on 9/25/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to R. Luneer. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Ely Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to R. Luneer. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Cohan, Gabriel)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Darla Drinan, upon Defendant Joshua Bisch served on 9/25/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to R. Luneer. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Ely Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to R. Luneer. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Cohan, Gabriel)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Darla Drinan, upon Defendant United States of America served on 9/25/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to R. Luneer. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Ely Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to R. Luneer. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Cohan, Gabriel)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Douglas Christner. (bm)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Joshua Bisch. (bm)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (bm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Darla Drinan. (Attachments: #1 Summons in A Civil Action - Joshua Bisch, #2 Summons in A Civil Action - Douglas Christner)(Cohan, Gabriel)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Darla Drinan. (Cohan, Gabriel)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Notice to counsel re consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Eastern Division Blackout Case. (ghap)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27633665 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Darla Drinan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Gabriel L Cohan added to party Darla Drinan(pty:pla))(Cohan, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darla Drinan v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Birsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Christner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Sates of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Bisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darla Drinan
Represented By: Gabriel L Cohan
Represented By: James S Iagmin
Represented By: Todd W Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?