Colleen Burke et al v. Lockheed Martin Company et al
Plaintiff: Gary Burke and Colleen Burke
Defendant: The Boeing Company, Elbit Systems Ltd., Elbit Systems of America LLC, Doe, Lockheed Martin Company and Does 4 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2020cv01647
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner granting #22 , #30 Non-Resident Attorney William J Katt APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Lockheed Martin Company, designating Gregory K Lee as local counsel. (jp)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner granting #18 , #23 Non-Resident Attorney David A Frank, II., APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Lockheed Martin Company, designating Gregory K Lee as local counsel. (jp)
September 24, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John P. Loringer on behalf of Defendant Lockheed Martin Company (Attorney John P. Loringer added to party Lockheed Martin Company(pty:dft))(Loringer, John)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2021 at 09:00 AM. See order for further details. (jre)
September 21, 2020 Filing 30 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William J. Katt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Lockheed Martin Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 9/15/2020, Receipt No. 28087874) filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof Of Service) (Lee, Gregory)
September 21, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William J. Katt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Lockheed Martin Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 9/15/2020, Receipt No. 28087874) #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Application is incomplete. Email address is missing from application. (Thrasher, Lupe)
September 21, 2020 Filing 28 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant The Boeing Company.. (Rothman, Max)
September 21, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH (1) NEGLIGENCE-PRODUCT LIABILITY; (2) STRICT PRODUCT LIABILITY; (3) BREACH OF EXPRESS AND IMPLIED WARRANTY filed by Defendant The Boeing Company.(Rothman, Max)
September 21, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Joseph Stumpf counsel for Plaintiffs Colleen Burke, Gary Burke. Adding Matthew Stumpf as counsel of record for COLLEEN BURKE, an individual and personal representative of the Estate of Kevin Burke, and GARY BURKE, an individual, for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs COLLEEN BURKE, an individual and personal representative of the Estate of Kevin Burke, and GARY BURKE, an individual. (Attorney Matthew Joseph Stumpf added to party Colleen Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Joseph Stumpf added to party Gary Burke(pty:pla))(Stumpf, Matthew)
September 18, 2020 Filing 25 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Company.. (Kearns, Patrick)
September 18, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Company.(Kearns, Patrick)
September 18, 2020 Filing 23 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David A. Frank II to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Lockheed Martin Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 9/16/2020, Receipt No. 28106494) filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof Of Service) (Lee, Gregory)
September 18, 2020 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William J. Katt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Lockheed Martin Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 9/15/2020, Receipt No. 28087874) filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof Of Service) (Lee, Gregory)
September 16, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David A. Frank II to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Lockheed Martin Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28106494) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (Thrasher, Lupe)
September 16, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gregory K Lee on behalf of Defendant Lockheed Martin Company (Attorney Gregory K Lee added to party Lockheed Martin Company(pty:dft))(Lee, Gregory)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: denying #17 Non-Resident Attorney William J Katt APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lockheed Martin Company. (lom)
September 16, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David A. Frank II to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Lockheed Martin Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28106494) filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof Of Service) (Kearns, Patrick)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William J. Katt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Lockheed Martin Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 9/15/2020, Receipt No. 28087874) filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof Of Service) (Kearns, Patrick)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Michael E. Scoville APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The Boeing Company, designating Max L. Rothman as local counsel. (lom)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S. Clackley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The Boeing Company, designating Max L. Rothman as local counsel. (lom)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael E. Scoville to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Boeing Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27762628) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (Thrasher, Lupe)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S. Clackley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Boeing Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27762490) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (Thrasher, Lupe)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael E. Scoville to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Boeing Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27762628) filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rothman, Max)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S. Clackley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Boeing Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27762490) filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rothman, Max)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Boeing Company answer now due 9/21/2020; Lockheed Martin Company answer now due 9/21/2020, re Joinder (non-motion) #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant The Boeing Company.(Rothman, Max)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Company (Kearns, Patrick)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge R. Gary Klausner. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-01647 RGK (SHKx). (lh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Shashi H. Kewalramani. New Case Number 5:20-cv-01647 RGK (SHKx). (lh)
August 14, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Colleen Burke, Gary Burke, upon Defendant The Boeing Company acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
August 14, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT #1 plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 3 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Elbit Systems of America LLC, filed by Plaintiffs Colleen Burke, Gary Burke. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/30/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
August 14, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT #1 plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 2 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Elbit Systems Ltd., filed by Plaintiffs Colleen Burke, Gary Burke. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/30/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
August 14, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT #1 plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be The Boeing Company, filed by Plaintiff Colleen Burke, Gary Burke. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/25/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
August 14, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Elbit Systems Ltd., Elbit Systems of America LLC, Lockheed Martin Company, The Boeing Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Colleen Burke, Gary Burke. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, CASE NUMBER CIV DS 2001751 ON 1/17/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 JOINDER filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Company joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Kearns, Patrick)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant The Boeing Company (Rothman, Max)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Rothman, Max)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVDS2001751 Receipt No: ACACDC-27631643 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court documents, #2 Exhibit B - List of Federal Land & Facilities) (Attorney Max Loren Rothman added to party The Boeing Company(pty:dft))(Rothman, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colleen Burke et al v. Lockheed Martin Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Max Loren Rothman
Represented By: Ronald A McIntire
Represented By: Jeffery S. Clackley
Represented By: Michael E. Scoville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elbit Systems Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elbit Systems of America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Represented By: Max Loren Rothman
Represented By: Ronald A McIntire
Represented By: Jeffery S. Clackley
Represented By: Michael E. Scoville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Company
Represented By: William J. Katt
Represented By: Patrick J Kearns
Represented By: Gregory K Lee
Represented By: John P. Loringer
Represented By: David A. Frank, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 4 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Burke
Represented By: Jesse Max Creed
Represented By: Nathan Emanuel Werksman
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Stumpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Burke
Represented By: Jesse Max Creed
Represented By: Nathan Emanuel Werksman
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Stumpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?