Jacoby Deshon Hildredth v. W. S. Pliler
Petitioner: Jacoby Deshon Hildredth
Respondent: W. S. Pliler
Case Number: 5:2020cv01667
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT by Judge David O. Carter, Related to: Order of Dismissal #5 . IT IS ADJUDGED that the petition is denied and this action is dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge David O. Carter. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT the Petition is DISMISSED without prejudice and judgment shall be entered accordingly. (see document for further details) (hr)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause #3 filed by Petitioner Jacoby Deshon Hildredth (hr)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE PETITION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Habeas Rules, the Court has conducted a preliminary review of the Petition and finds it appears subject to dismissal for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Petitioner is therefore ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing within thirty (30) days of this Order explaining why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. (Attachments: #1 Blank Ntc of Dismissal) (mba)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (esa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early, (Filing fee $ 5 paid), filed by petitioner Jacoby Deshon Hildredth. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacoby Deshon Hildredth v. W. S. Pliler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jacoby Deshon Hildredth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: W. S. Pliler
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?